Contreras v. Andrews et al
Court Docket Sheet

5:2017-cv-00567 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 116 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/07/2017
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Raynon Andrews, Kathleen Glasscock, Beronica Goodwin, and Ellen Pass filed by Anna Marie Contreras.(SPT)
2
04/21/2017
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants, filed by Anna Marie Contreras. Modified on 4/21/2017 (AHI).
3
04/24/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Tammy Shamise-McCabe on behalf of Anna Marie Contreras
04/28/2017
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2836944 (B4601079781). related document 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Raynon Andrews, Kathleen Glasscock, Beronica Goodwin, and Ellen Pass filed by Anna Marie Contreras.(SPT). Modified on 5/1/2017 (SPT). (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
05/01/2017
Summons Issued as to Abstance, Raynon Andrews, Baker, Leon Bradley, Brasher, Burchell, Karen Bynum, Naideen Clopton, Brandon Colwell, Cox, Josh Crumbley, Denbrook, Edwards, Jerry Edwards, Anthony Funderburk, Kathleen Glasscock, Beronica Goodwin, Seth Hazen, Clint Johnson, G. Johnson, Kyle Johnson, Andrew Justice, Roy Kelley, Jesse Key, Lee, Jeremey Lee, Love, Amanda Maddox, M. Martin, McQueen, Kristian Moody, Tyler Nau, Britt Parker, Ellen Pass, Perwitz, Reid, Blake Robinson, Dale Rock, James Rosenblum, Madison Rutherford, Donna Schrimsher, Charity Shoulders, Sparks, Renee Tucker, Charlotte Turner, and Austin Zimmerman by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service.
5
05/11/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Karen Bynum served on 5/9/2017, answer due 5/30/2017.
6
05/12/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Raynon Andrews served on 5/9/2017, answer due 5/30/2017.
7
05/12/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Brasher served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
8
05/12/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Clint Johnson served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
9
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Abstance served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
10
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Baker served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
11
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Leon Bradley served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
12
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Burchell served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
13
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Naideen Clopton served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
14
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Brandon Colwell served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
15
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Cox served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
16
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Josh Crumbley served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
17
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Denbrook served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
18
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Jerry Edwards served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
19
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Edwards served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
20
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Anthony Funderburk served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
21
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Kathleen Glasscock served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
22
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Beronica Goodwin served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
23
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Seth Hazen served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
24
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. G. Johnson served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
25
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Kyle Johnson served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
26
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Andrew Justice served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
27
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Roy Kelley served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
28
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Jesse Key served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
29
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Jeremey Lee served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
30
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Lee served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
31
05/15/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Love served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
32
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Ellen Pass served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
33
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Sparks served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
34
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Perwitz served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
35
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Amanda Maddox served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
36
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Reid served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
37
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Charlotte Turner served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
38
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. M. Martin served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
39
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Austin Zimmerman served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
40
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Blake Robinson served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
41
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Dale Rock served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
42
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. McQueen served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
43
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Kristian Moody served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
44
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. James Rosenblum served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
45
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Tyler Nau served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
46
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Donna Schrimsher served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
47
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Charity Shoulders served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
48
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Britt Parker served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
49
05/16/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Marie Contreras. Renee Tucker served on 5/10/2017, answer due 5/31/2017.
50
05/22/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Amended Complaint
Motion is RIPE 5/22/2017. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.
Filed by Karen Bynum, Naideen Clopton, Amanda Maddox, Charlotte Turner.
51
05/22/2017
TEXT ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Charlotte Turner, Nadine Clopton, Karen Bynum, and Amanda Maddox shall file their answer or other response to the amended complaint within seven (7) days after Judge Kallon issues a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss in Contreras v. Morgan County Commn, 5:16-cv-00361-AKK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 5/22/17.
52
05/30/2017
ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint by Raynon Andrews.
53
05/31/2017
ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint by Ellen Pass.
54
05/31/2017
ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint by Beronica Goodwin.
55
05/31/2017
ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint by Kathleen Glasscock.
56
06/01/2017
NOTICE by Abstance, Baker, Brasher, Burchell, Brandon Colwell, Cox, Josh Crumbley, Denbrook, Edwards, Jerry Edwards, Anthony Funderburk, Seth Hazen, Clint Johnson, G. Johnson, Kyle Johnson, Andrew Justice, Roy Kelley, Jesse Key, Lee, Jeremey Lee, Love, M. Martin, McQueen, Kristian Moody, Tyler Nau, Britt Parker, Perwitz, Reid, Blake Robinson, Dale Rock, James Rosenblum, Madison Rutherford, Donna Schrimsher, Charity Shoulders, Sparks, Renee Tucker, Austin Zimmerman re 4 Summons Issued, Notice of Limited Representation
57
06/01/2017
MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Service of Process on Defendants by Abstance, Baker, Brasher, Burchell, Brandon Colwell, Cox, Josh Crumbley, Denbrook, Edwards, Jerry Edwards, Anthony Funderburk, Seth Hazen, Clint Johnson, G. Johnson, Kyle Johnson, Andrew Justice, Roy Kelley, Jesse Key, Lee, Jeremey Lee, Love, M. Martin, McQueen, Kristian Moody, Tyler Nau, Britt Parker, Perwitz, Reid, Blake Robinson, Dale Rock, James Rosenblum, Madison Rutherford, Donna Schrimsher, Charity Shoulders, Sparks, Renee Tucker, Austin Zimmerman.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
58
06/08/2017
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT; the case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr.; Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III no longer assigned to the case; please use case number 5:17-cv-567-HNJ on all subsequent pleadings. (SPT)
59
06/13/2017
ORDER that the Plaintiff shall file a response to the 57 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Service of Process on Defendants within 14 days from the date of entry of this order; Defendants shall file any reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 06/13/17. (SPT)
60
06/15/2017
REASSIGNMENT ORDER; The Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a District Judge for all further proceedings as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 06/14/17.
61
06/15/2017
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT; The case has been reassigned to Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 5:17-cv-567-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. (SPT)
62
06/15/2017
RESPONSE to Motion re 57 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Service of Process on Defendants filed by Anna Marie Contreras.
63
06/19/2017
INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/19/2017.
64
06/21/2017
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Karen Bynum, Naideen Clopton, Amanda Maddox, Charlotte Turner.
65
06/22/2017
LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leon Bradley Modified on 6/22/2017
66
06/23/2017
ORDER denying 64 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Court denies the parties' joint motion to consolidate without prejudice because the motion is procedurally flawed. A motion to consolidate should bear the styles of both the older and newer cases and should be filed in both cases. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on June 23, 2017.
67
06/28/2017
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Raynon Andrews, Karen Bynum, Naideen Clopton, Amanda Maddox, Ellen Pass, Charlotte Turner.
68
07/03/2017
ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER- The Attorney General hereby waives any further service upon him of any pleadings, discovery and other matters filed in this cause.
69
07/06/2017
ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint by Leon Bradley.
70
07/21/2017
ORDER - The Court finds that these actions involve sufficient common questions of law and fact. Therefore, the Court CONSOLIDATES these matters for purposes of discovery, pretrial proceedings, and trial. Anna Marie Contreras, as the personal representative of the Estate of Vanuelas Nicholas Martinez v. Raynon Andrews, et al., No. 5:17-cv-00567-MHH shall be the lead case.2 Going forward, the Court DIRECTS the parties to please file all documents under case number 5:17-cv-00567-MHH and to use the style that appears in this order. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/21/2017. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
71
07/26/2017
ORDER - The Court GRANTS the unopposed motion to quash service in Case No. 17-cv-567-MHH. (Doc. 57 in Case No. 17-cv-567; see also Doc. 62 in Case No. 17-cv-567). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 1, and in an effort to promote judicial economy and to manage its docket effectively, the Court GRANTS Ms. Contrerass motion to for leave to file an amended complaint in Case No. 16-cv-361. (Doc. 117 in Case No. 16-cv-361).1 The Court also GRANTS Ms. Contrerass motion to amend Nurse Sextons name in Case No. 16-cv-361. (Doc. 140 in Case No. 16-cv-361). On or before August 15, 2017, Ms. Contreras shall please file one consolidated amended complaint for both case numbers that includes all of the claims she wishes to assert as part of this action. The consolidated amended complaint will become the operative pleading in Case No. 17-cv-567 and Case No. 16-cv-361. Therefore, the Court DENIES as MOOT Ms. Contrerass motions to join Dr. Andrews as a party defendant and the defendants motions to dismiss in Case No. 16-cv-361. (Docs. 89, 91, 93, 95, 104, 105, 125, 128, 130, 163 in Case No. 16-cv-361). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/26/2017. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
72
07/26/2017
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nadine Clopton, Jennifer Hairsine, Southern Health Partners Inc, Jennifer Stalls, Charlotte Turner, Raynon Andrews, Karen Bynum, Naideen Clopton, Amanda Maddox, Ellen Pass. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
73
07/26/2017
TEXT ORDER: Attorney Brad A. Chynoweth has filed a Motion to Withdraw. (Doc. 72). The Court Grants the Motion. Attorneys Daniel F. Beasley and/or LaBella Alvis will continue to represent the defendants as set out in the Motion. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/26/2017.
74
07/31/2017
First MOTION to Substitute Attorney M. Jansen Voss by Johnny Bates, Karen Bynum, Nadine Clopton, Jennifer Hairsine, Amanda Maddux, Morgan County Commission, A. Porter, Quality Correctional Healthcare, Southern Health Partners Inc, Jennifer Stalls, Charlotte Turner, Raynon Andrews, Naideen Clopton, Kathleen Glasscock, Beronica Goodwin. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
75
08/04/2017
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's July 26, 2017 order (Doc. 71 in Case 17-cv-567; Doc. 169 in Case 16-cv-361), Ms. Contreras shall file a consolidated amended complaint on or before August 15, 2017. The defendants shall respond to the consolidated amended complaint on or before August 29, 2017. The parties shall please confer and file a consolidated Rule 26(f) report on or before September 12, 2017. With the exception of the deadline concerning the parties' Rule 26(f) obligations, all other provisions of the Court's initial order remain operative. (See Doc. 63 in 17-cv-567; Doc. 168 in 16-cv-361). Because Case 17-cv-567 and Case 16-cv-361 have been consolidated, the Court STRIKES the original initial order in Case 16-cv-361. (Doc. 55). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/4/2017. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
76
08/15/2017
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, filed by Anna Marie Contreras.
77
08/23/2017
MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Anna Marie Contreras. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
1
Third Amended Complaint
1 Attachment
78
08/25/2017
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Anna Marie Contreras has filed an unopposed motion asking for leave to file a third amended complaint. The Court Grants the motion. On or before August 28, 2017, Ms. Contreras shall file her amended complaint attached to the motion as Doc. 77-1. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/25/2017. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
79
08/25/2017
AMENDED COMPLAINT Third against All Defendants, filed by Anna Marie Contreras.
80
08/28/2017
TEXT ORDER: On August 28, 2017, the undersigned's docketing clerk received an email concerning a deadline for the defendants to respond to the plaintiff's third amended complaint. The Court has compared Ms. Contreras's second amended complaint with her third amended complaint. (Doc. 76 and Doc. 79 in Case 17-cv-567; Doc. 174 and Doc. 177 in Case 16-cv-361). In her third amended complaint, Ms. Contreras corrected typographical errors and clarified allegations about the employer of certain defendants. The substantive numbered paragraphs in the two documents are nearly identical. Accordingly, the defendants shall respond to the third amended complaint on or before September 1, 2017. The parties shall please confer and file a Rule 26(f) report on or before September 15, 2017. The Court reminds the parties to please file all documents in this consolidated action in case number 16-cv-361 and case number 17-cv-567. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/28/2017. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
81
08/30/2017
ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Leon Bradley.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
82
09/01/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Helen Kidd on behalf of Larry Berzett, Aaron Dawson, Ana Franklin, Morgan County, Alabama, Larry Berzett, Aaron Dawson, Ana Franklin Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
83
09/01/2017
ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Ellen Pass.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
84
09/01/2017
ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Larry Berzett, Ana Franklin, Larry Berzett, Ana Franklin.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
85
09/01/2017
ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Amanda Maddux.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
86
09/01/2017
ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Karen Bynum.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
87
09/01/2017
ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Southern Health Partners Inc.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
88
09/01/2017
MOTION to Dismiss by Morgan County, Alabama. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
89
09/01/2017
ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Jennifer Hairsine.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
90
09/01/2017
Brief re(181 in 5:16-cv-00361-MHH, 88 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) MOTION to Dismiss. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
91
09/01/2017
MOTION to Dismiss by Aaron Dawson, Aaron Dawson. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
92
09/01/2017
R. Andrews, M.D.'s ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Raynon Andrews.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
93
09/01/2017
J. Bates, M.D.'s ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Johnny Bates.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
94
09/01/2017
N. Clopton's ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Naideen Clopton.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
95
09/01/2017
K. Glasscock's ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Kathleen Glasscock.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
96
09/01/2017
B. Goodwin's ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Beronica Goodwin.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
97
09/01/2017
QCHC, Inc.'s ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by QCHC Inc.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
98
09/01/2017
T. Sexton's ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Tabitha M Sexton.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
99
09/01/2017
J. Stalls' ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Jennifer Stalls.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
100
09/01/2017
K. Stewart's ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Katina Stewart.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
101
09/01/2017
C. Turner's ANSWER to (79 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Charlotte Turner.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
102
09/08/2017
Amended ANSWER to (76 in 5:17-cv-00567-MHH) Amended Complaint by Raynon Andrews.Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
103
09/12/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by James Bradley Emmons on behalf of Raynon Andrews, Karen Bynum, Nadine Clopton, Kathleen Glasscock, Beronica Goodwin, Jennifer Hairsine, Amanda Maddux, Ellen Pass, Southern Health Partners Inc, Jennifer Stalls, Charlotte Turner, Naideen Clopton, Jennifer Hairsine, Amanda Maddox Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
104
09/15/2017
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
105
09/15/2017
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for Monday, 10/22/2018, at 11:00 AM, in second floor chambers, Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL. Discovery due by 10/31/2018. Dispositive motions due by 11/30/2018. See Order for other deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/15/2017. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
106
09/15/2017
QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/15/2017. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
107
10/04/2017
TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS QCHC's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Motion to Substitute Counsel. (Doc. 74 in this case and Doc. 172 under consolidated case no. 5:16-cv-361-MHH). Defendant QCHC will continue to be represented by attorney Mickey J. Voss in these actions. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/4/2017. Associated Cases: 5:17-cv-00567-MHH, 5:16-cv-00361-MHH
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.