Cook Inlet Energy LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2015-bk-00236 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
doc
05/24/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
doc
06/04/2018
Appeal - Order From Appellate Court Re: Disposition of Appeal
06/04/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/04/2018
Notice of Change of Address for Creditor
06/05/2018
Letter
06/06/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
06/20/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Case Status Report
07/19/2018
Generic Motion
07/19/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
07/20/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
07/24/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/26/2018
Postconfirmation Progress Report
07/27/2018
Hearing
07/30/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
07/30/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
07/31/2018
Terminate Document / Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Terminate Document / Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Unterminate Motion / Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
08/31/2018
Entry of Final Decree
09/04/2018
Final Decree (Order from Judge) (SA)
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
09/05/2018
Final Decree (Order from Judge) (SA)
09/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Close BK Case Utility (See Final Decree for Regular BK Closings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Postconfirmation Progress Report
10/01/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
10/15/2018
Trial Brief
10/22/2018
Stipulation
11/01/2018
Stipulation
11/09/2018
Case Status Report
11/14/2018
Approving Stipulation (SA)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.