Cook v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00088 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
06/18/2018
Answer to Complaint
11
06/18/2018
Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Social Security)
12
07/15/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
13
08/14/2018
Summary Judgment
14
08/17/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
15
02/06/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
16
03/05/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.