Copeland v. Municapilty
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00298 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/18/2018
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
2
01/04/2019
Order to Show Cause
3
01/09/2019
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
4
02/15/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
5
02/21/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.