Copper River Seafoods, Inc. v. Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00039 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
83
05/23/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
84
05/25/2018
Notice of Appearance
85
05/27/2018
File Excess Pages
86
05/27/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
87
05/27/2018
Leave to File Document
88
05/29/2018
In Limine
89
05/29/2018
Declaration
90
05/29/2018
In Limine
91
05/29/2018
In Limine
92
05/29/2018
In Limine
93
05/30/2018
In Limine
94
05/30/2018
In Limine
95
05/30/2018
In Limine
96
05/30/2018
Seal
98
05/30/2018
In Limine
99
06/04/2018
Notice (Other)
100
06/05/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
101
06/05/2018
Memorandum
102
06/05/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
103
06/05/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
104
06/05/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
105
06/05/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
106
06/05/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
107
06/05/2018
Notice (Other)
108
06/06/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
109
06/06/2018
Declaration
110
06/06/2018
Declaration
111
06/06/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
112
06/06/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
113
06/06/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
114
06/06/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
115
06/11/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
116
06/19/2018
Notice (Other)
117
06/19/2018
Notice (Other)
118
06/19/2018
Notice (Other)
119
07/06/2018
Notice (Other)
120
07/06/2018
Notice (Other)
121
07/13/2018
Errata
08/06/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Text entry; no document attached.)
123
08/08/2018
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
124
08/13/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
125
08/13/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
126
08/13/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
127
08/13/2018
Notice (Other)
128
08/13/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
129
08/14/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
130
08/15/2018
Transcript
131
08/17/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
132
08/17/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
133
08/20/2018
Stipulation
134
08/20/2018
Withdraw
135
08/27/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw
136
09/04/2018
Witness List
137
09/04/2018
Notice (Other)
138
09/04/2018
Witness List
09/05/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
Order on Motion to Seal (Text entry; no document attached.)
150
09/10/2018
Response to Objections to Exhibits
151
09/10/2018
Statement
152
09/10/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
153
09/10/2018
Objections to Exhibits
154
09/10/2018
Response to Objections to Exhibits
155
09/11/2018
Notice (Other)
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
157
09/12/2018
Notice (Other)
158
09/13/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
159
09/13/2018
Declaration
160
09/17/2018
Trial Brief
161
09/17/2018
Proposed Voir Dire
162
09/17/2018
Proposed Voir Dire
163
09/17/2018
Statement
164
09/19/2018
Trial Brief
165
09/19/2018
Trial Brief
166
09/19/2018
Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
09/19/2018
Order on Motion in Limine (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Order on Motion in Limine (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Order on Motion in Limine (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Order on Motion in Limine (Text entry; no document attached.)
168
09/20/2018
Reconsideration
169
09/21/2018
Reconsideration
170
09/21/2018
Reconsideration
171
09/21/2018
Notice of Settlement
172
09/21/2018
Order
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.