Corey Clark
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81814 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
06/20/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
06/20/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
06/22/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
18
07/03/2018
Employee Income Records
19
07/03/2018
Chapter 13 Plan
20
07/03/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
08/01/2018
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
08/08/2018
Approving
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.