Corlette Michelle Burns
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-03970 (alnb)

Proof of Claim Attachment 3001(c)(1)and(d) (Claim # 13) Supporting documents to POC Filed by Creditor Stuart Greenberg.

Fill in this information to identify the case: Debtor 1. Corlette Michelle Burns Debtor 2 (Spouse, if filing) United States Bankruptcy Court for the: Northern District of Alabama Case number 17 - 03970 - DSC13 Official Form 410 Proof of Claim 12 / 15 Read the instructions before filling out this form. This form Is for making a claim for payment In a bankruptcy case, Do not use this form to make a request for payment of an administrative expense. Make such a request according to 11U.S. C. 5 503. Filers must leave out or redact information that is entitled to privacy on this form or on any attached documents, Attach redacted copies of any documents that support the claim, such as promissory notes, purchase orders, invoices, itemized statements of running accounts, contracts, judgments, mortgages, and security agreements. Do not send original documents; they may be destroyed after scanning. If the documents are not available, explain in an attachment. A person who files a fraudulent claim could be fined up to $ 500, 000, imprisoned for up to 5 years, or both. 18U.S. C. SS 152, 157, and 3571. FIII In all the Information about the claim as of the date the case was filed. That date ls on the notice of bankruptcy (Form 309) that you received. Part 1: Identify the claim 1. Who is the current creditor ? Stuart M. Greenberg Name of the current creditor (the person or entity to be paid for this claim) Other names the creditor used with the debtor 2. Has this claim been acquired from someone else ? A No Q Yes. From whom ? Where should notices to the creditor be sent ? Where should notices and payments to the creditor be sent ? Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure (FRBP) 2002 (9) Galloway Scott Moss & Hancock LLC Name 2200 Woodcrest Place Suite 310 Number Street Birmingham 35209 City ZIP Code Walter F. Scott III, Esq Contact phone Contact email Walter @ gallowayscott. com Where should payments to the creditor be sent ? (if different) Galloway Scott Moss & Hancock LLC Name 2200 Woodcrest Place Suite 310 Number Street Birmingham AL 35209 City State ZIP Code 205 - 949 - 5580 Contact phone 200 - 349 - 3500 AL State Contact email Walter @ gallowayscott. com Uniform claim identifier for electronic payments in chapter 13 (if you use one): — — — — 4. Does this claim amend M No one already filed ? Yes. Claim number on court claims registry (if known) Filed on MM / DD / YYYY A No 5. Do you know If anyone else has filed a proof of claim for this claim ? O Yes. Who made the earlier filing ? Official Form 410 Proof of Claim page 1 Case 17 - 03970 - DSC13 Doc Filed 01 / 24 / 18 Entered 01 / 24 / 18 13: 08: 33 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 5 Part 2 Give Information About the claim as of the Date the Case Was Filed 6. Do you have any number O NO you use to identify the A Yes. Last 4 digits of the debtor's account or any number you use to identify the debtor: debtor ? _ 4 | 7. How much is the claim ? 15, 344. 04. Does this amount Include Interest or other charges ? O No A Yes. Attach statement itemizing interest, fees, expenses, or other charges required by Bankruptcy Rule 3001 (c) (2) (A) . | 8. What is the basis of the claim ? Examples: Goods sold, money loaned, lease, services performed, personal injury or wrongful death, or credit card. Attach redacted copies of any documents supporting the claim required by Bankruptcy Rule 3001 (c) . Limit disclosing information that is entitled to privacy, such as health care information. Certificate of Judgment 9. Is all or part of the claim secured ? NO u Yes. The claim is secured by a lien on property. Nature of property: O Real estate. If the claim is secured by the debtor's principal residence, file a Mortgage Proof of Claim Attachment (Official Form 410 - A) with this Proof of Claim. U Motor vehicle O other. Describe: Basis for perfectlon: Attach redacted copies of documents, if any, that show evidence of perfection of a security interest (for example, a mortgage, lien, certificate of title, financing statement, or other document that shows the lien has been filed or recorded .) Value of property: Amount of the claim that is secured: A en Amount of the claim that is unsecured: $ . _ (The sum of the secured and unsecured amounts should match the amount in line 7 .) Amount necessary to cure any default as of the date of the petition: $ Annual Interest Rate (when case was filed) . O Fixed O variable 10. Is this claim based on a 4 No lease ? O Yes. Amount necessary to cure any default as of the date of the petition. 11. Is this claim subject to a 7 No right of setoff ? Yes. Identify the property: Official Form 410 Proof of Claim page 2 Case 17 - 03970 - DSC13 Doc Filed 01 / 24 / 18 Entered 01 / 24 / 18 13: 08: 33 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 5 Á NO Q Yes. Check all that apply: Amount entitled to priority 12. Is all or part of the claim entitled to priority under 11U.S. C. $ 507 (a) ? A claim may be partly priority and partly nonpriority. For example, in some categories, the law limits the amount entitled to priority. U Domestic support obligations (including alimony and child support) under 11U.S. C. & 507 (a) (1) (A) or (a) (1) (B) . U up to $ 2, 775 * of deposits toward purchase, lease, or rental of property or services for personal, family, or household use. 11U.S. C. 507 (a) (7) . GA U Wages, salaries, or commissions (up to $ 12, 475 *) earned within 180 days before the bankruptcy petition is filed or the debtor's business ends, whichever is earlier. 11U.S. C. S 507 (a) (4) . O Taxes or penalties owed to governmental units. 11U.S. C. S 507 (a) (8) . O Contributions to an employee benefit plan, 11U.S. C. & 507 (a) (5) . U other. Specify subsection of 11U.S. C. & 507 (a) (that applies. * Amounts are subject to adjustment on 4 / 01 / 16 and every 3 years after that for cases begun on or after the date of adjustment. Part 3: Sign Below The person completing Check the appropriate box: this proof of claim must sign and date it. O I am the creditor. FRBP 9011 (b) . 4 I am the creditor's attorney or authorized agent. If you file this claim O I am the trustee, or the debtor, or their authorized agent. Bankruptcy Rule 3004. electronically, FRBP 5005 (a) (2) authorizes courts O I am a guarantor, surety, endorser, or other codebtor. Bankruptcy Rule 3005. to establish local rules specifying what a signature I understand that an authorized signature on this Proof of Claim serves as an acknowledgment that when calculating the amount of the claim, the creditor gave the debtor credit for any payments received toward the debt. A person who files a fraudulent clalm could be | have examined the information in this proof of Claim and have a reasonable belief that the information is true fraudulent claim could be I have e nd have a reasonal fined up to $ 500, 000, and correct. imprisoned for up to 5 years, or both. 18U.S. C. SS 152, 157, and I declare under penalty of perjury that the foregoing is true and correct. 3571. Executed on date 01 / 23 / 2018 MM I OD 7 YYYY IS. IM M Signature Print the name of the person who is completing and signing this claim: Name Walter F. Scott III. First name Middle name Last name Title Attorney for Creditor Galloway Scott Moss & Hancock, LLC Identify the corporate servicer as the company if the authorized agent is a servicer. Company Address 2200 Woodcrest Place, Suite 310 Number Street Birmingham City 205 - 949 - 5580 AL 35209 ZIP Code Email Walter @ gallowayscott. com State Contact phone Official Form 410 Proof of Claim page 3 Case 17 - 03970 - DSC13 Doc Filed 01 / 24 / 18 Entered 01 / 24 / 18 13: 08: 33 Desc Main Document Page 3 of 5 ITEMIZATION OF CLAIM $ 14, 546. 00 | Certificate of Judgment Post Judgment interest @ 7. 5 % (5 / 2 / 17 - 1 / 23 / 18 = | 267 days @ $ 2. 9889 / day) $ 798. 04 TOTAL DISBURSEMENTS $ 15, 344. 04 Case 17 - 03970 - DSC13 Doc Filed 01 / 24 / 18 Entered 01 / 24 / 18 13: 08: 33 Desc Main Document Page 4 of 5 AVSO312 ALABAMA JUDICIAL DATA CENTER SHELBY COUNTY CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT cv 2016 000 495. 00 COREY B MOORE G - - - - - - - - IN THE CIRCUIT COURT OF SHELBY COUNTY | STUART GREENBERG VS CORLETTE STEWART PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: SCOTT WALTER FRANCIS III 2200 WOODCREST PL STE 310 BIRMINGHAM AL 35209 M N O 20170509000160700 1771 $ 16. 00 Shelby Cnty Judge of Probata, AL 06 / 09 / 2017 10: 36: 30 AM FILED / CERT | I, MARY H. HARRIS, CLERK OF THE ABOVE NAMED COURT. HEREBY CERTIFY THAT ON 05 / 02 / 2017 PLAINTIFF, GREENBERG STUART RECOVERED I OF DEFENDANT IN SAID COURT A JUDGMENT WITHOUT WAIVER OF EXEMPTIONS FOR THE SUM OF $ 14, 546. 00 DOLLARS PLUS $ . 00 DOLLARS COURT COSTS, AND THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY (S) OF RECORD WAS: MOSS SYLVION SEFFEL | GIVEN UNDER MY HAND THIS DATE 05 / 04 / 2017 MUA HALUAAJI MERK: MAKE H. HARRISHT P. O. Box 1810 COLUMBIANA AL 35051 (205) 669 - 3760 WEBSITE: HTTP: / / 18J ou U H T. GOV | . A A 1 A UT R | - - - OPERATOR: STP PREPARED: 05 / 04 / 2017 DEFENDANT PARTY'S ATTORNEY: STEWART CORLETTE 2 406 FOREST LAKES LANE CHELSEA, AL 3 504 3 - OOOO Case 17 - 03970 - DSC13 Doc Filed 01 / 24 / 18 Entered 01 / 24 / 18 13: 08: 33 Desc Main Document Page 5 of 5

Debtor's Objection to Claim # 13 of Stuart M. Greenberg in the amount of $15,344.04 Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns. (Shinn, J.)

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE:)) Case Number: 17-03970-DSC Corlette Michelle Burns)) Chapter: 13 Debtor) OBJECTION TO CLAIM PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3007-1(c) COMES NOW the Debtor, by and through her attorney, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §502, Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 3007, and Local Rule 3007-1, to objection to Claim No. 13 of Stuart M. Greenberg (the "Claimant") filed on January 24, 2018 in the amount of $15,344.04. The grounds alleged for this action are that: The claim is a duplicate of another claim, Claim No. filed on in the amount of $ by; X The claim was untimely filed, and the Claimant is a creditor whose name and address were accurately shown on the debtor's timely filed schedules and matrix; The claim is satisfied or excessive as evidenced by a refund of payment from the Claimant to the Trustee or debtor or written notice from the Claimant to the Trustee or debtor; The claim is not entitled to secured status; **Note: if the objection to claim is because the Claimant's lien on the debtor's property was avoided by an order previously entered by this Court, the party filing the objection must attach the applicable order to the objection. The claim is for an unsecured debt or obligation that was incurred prior to the filing of a prior bankruptcy case in which the debtor received a discharge; or **Note: the party filing the objection to claim based on this ground must attach copies of the petition filed in the prior case, the schedule listing the debt or obligation, and the discharge order to the objection. The claim is not entitled to priority status. The certificate of service verifying service of this objection to claim is found on the Notice of Objection to Claim and Opportunity for Hearing. DATED: January 24, 2018 /s/ J. Suzanne Shinn J. Suzanne Shinn, Attorney for Debtor Bond, Botes, Reese & Shinn, P.C. 600 University Park Place, Suite 510 Birmingham, Alabama 35209 (205) 802-2200 Case 17-03970-DSC13 Doc 41 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 18:54:18 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 5 Case 17-03970-DSC13 Doc 41 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 18:54:18 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 5 Case 17-03970-DSC13 Doc 41 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 18:54:18 Desc Main Document Page 3 of 5 Case 17-03970-DSC13 Doc 41 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 18:54:18 Desc Main Document Page 4 of 5 Case 17-03970-DSC13 Doc 41 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 18:54:18 Desc Main Document Page 5 of 5

Notice and Opportunity for Hearing Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns (related document(s)[41] Debtor's Objection to Claim # 13 of Stuart M. Greenberg in the amount of $15,344.04 Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns. (Shinn, J.) filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns). (Shinn, J.)

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE:)) Case Number: 17-03970-DSC Corlette Michelle Burns)) Chapter: 13 Debtor) NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO CLAIM AND OPPORTUNITY FOR HEARING NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN that, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §502, Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 3007, and Local Rule 3007-1(c), Corlette Michelle Burns ("Objecting Party") filed an objection ("Objection") (Doc. No. 41) to the allowance of Claim No 13 of Stuart M. Greenberg ("Claimant") filed on January 24, 2018 in the amount of $15,344.04. A copy of the Objection accompanies this notice. YOU ARE FURTHER NOTIFIED that any opposition or other response to said Objection must be filed with the clerk's office within 30 days of the date of this notice, and a copy must be served on the party filing such Objection, the debtor or debtor in possession, the trustee, any other affected creditors, any committee appointed in the case, and any other entity as the Court may direct. If a response to said Objection is filed and served within the time specified, the Court will schedule a hearing to consider the Objection and the response thereto. If a timely response is filed, you will be notified of the time, date, and place of the hearing. At the hearing, the party opposing or otherwise responding to the Objection must appear in person or through an attorney and be prepared to advocate their position by testimony from witnesses and other evidence. IF NO RESPONSE IS FILED WITHIN THE TIME SPECIFIED, THE COURT MAY ENTER AN ORDER GRANTING THE RELIEF SOUGHT IN THE OBJECTION WITHOUT A HEARING. DATED: January 24, 2018 /s/ J. Suzanne Shinn J. Suzanne Shinn, Attorney for Debtor Bond, Botes, Reese & Shinn, P.C. 600 University Park Place, Suite 510 Birmingham, Alabama 35209 (205) 802-2200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE The undersigned certifies that on January 24, 2018, the above Notice of Objection to Claim and Opportunity for Hearing and a copy of the Objection, were served on the following: VIA CM/ECF AND U.S. MAIL VIA CM/ECF AND U.S. MAIL Stuart M. Greenberg Stuart M. Greenberg c/o Galloway Scott Moss & Hancock, LLC c/o Spain & Gillon, LLC 2200 Woodcrest Place, Suite 310 The Zinzer Building Birmingham, AL 35209 2117 Second Avenue North wfs3@gallowayscott.com Birmingham, AL 35203 wfm@spain-gillon.com Corlette Michelle Burns Bradford W. Caraway 1623 5th Place NW Chapter 13 Trustee Center Point, AL 35215 ctmail@ch13bham.com /s/ J. Suzanne Shinn J. Suzanne Shinn Case 17-03970-DSC13 Doc 42 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 19:04:35 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 267 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/14/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Corlette Michelle Burns (Shinn, J.)
3
09/14/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns. (Shinn, J.)
4
09/14/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns. (Shinn, J.)
5
09/14/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns. (Shinn, J.)
09/14/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-03970-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21160529. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/15/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
7
09/15/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/25/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/14/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 01/23/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 03/13/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 12/26/2017.
8
09/15/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns. (Shinn, J.)
9
09/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 09/17/2017.
10
09/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns). Notice Date 09/17/2017.
11
09/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 09/17/2017.
12
09/20/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A.
13
10/26/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 10/25/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
14
10/30/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
15
10/30/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 14 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 11/14/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
16
11/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 15 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/01/2017.
17
11/02/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 3 of Internal Revenue Service in the amount of $10,341.48 Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns. (Shinn, J.)
18
11/02/2017
Motion to Determine Value of 2011 Mercedes-Benz ML350 financed by Capital One Auto Finance Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns (Shinn, J.)
19
11/03/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 17 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns). Hearing scheduled 12/5/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
20
11/03/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 18 Motion to Determine Value filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns). Hearing scheduled 11/28/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
21
11/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/05/2017.
22
11/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/05/2017.
23
11/07/2017
Response to (Re Item: 18 Motion to Determine Value of 2011 Mercedes-Benz ML350 financed by Capital One Auto Finance filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns) Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A.
24
11/09/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 23 Response filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A.). Hearing scheduled 11/28/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
25
11/13/2017
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Stuart Greenberg (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns. (Shinn, J.)).
26
11/16/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 11/16/2017 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing, 14 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 12/12/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
27
11/16/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 25 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Stuart Greenberg). Hearing scheduled 12/12/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
28
11/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 11/18/2017.
29
11/20/2017
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 18 Motion to Determine Value of 2011 Mercedes-Benz ML350 financed by Capital One Auto Finance Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns (Shinn, J.)). (Shinn, J.)
30
11/20/2017
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns. (Shinn, J.)
31
11/20/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns. (Shinn, J.)). (Shinn, J.)
32
11/22/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
33
12/01/2017
Order Withdrawing Motion to Determine Value of Security of 2011 Mercedes-Benz financed by Capital One Auto Finance (Related Doc # 18) Signed on 12/1/2017.
34
12/03/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 33 Order on Motion to Determine Value). Notice Date 12/03/2017.
35
12/05/2017
Order Withdrawing on Objection to Claim(s) 3 Signed on 12/5/2017 (RE: related document(s) 17 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns).
36
12/07/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 12/07/2017.
37
12/14/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 12/14/2017 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing, 14 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 25 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Stuart Greenberg). Hearing scheduled 1/30/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
38
12/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 12/16/2017.
39
12/18/2017
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns. (Shinn, J.)
40
12/28/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP f/k/a AIS Data Services d/b/a/ Ascension Capital Group.
doc
01/24/2018
Proof of Claim Attachment 3001(c)(1)and(d) (Claim # 13) Supporting documents to POC Filed by Creditor Stuart Greenberg.
41
01/24/2018
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 13 of Stuart M. Greenberg in the amount of $15,344.04 Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns. (Shinn, J.)
42
01/24/2018
Notice and Opportunity for Hearing Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns (related document(s)[41] Debtor's Objection to Claim # 13 of Stuart M. Greenberg in the amount of $15,344.04 Filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns. (Shinn, J.) filed by Debtor Corlette Michelle Burns). (Shinn, J.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.