Corrales v. Federal Express Corporation Short Term Disability Plan et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona

3:2017-cv-08207 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
40
07/20/2018
Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
41
07/20/2018
Summary Judgment
42
07/20/2018
Statement of Facts
07/23/2018
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
08/20/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
45
08/20/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
46
08/22/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
47
08/23/2018
Response to Motion for Summary Judgment
50
09/14/2018
Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions
09/17/2018
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
10/26/2018
Order
53
11/02/2018
Response to Motion for Summary Judgment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.