Corrigan et al v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00207 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
22
06/21/2018
Order on Motion to Compel
23
07/25/2018
Status Report
24
07/31/2018
Order
25
08/20/2018
Stipulation
08/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
09/20/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
29
09/20/2018
Memorandum
30
09/25/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
09/25/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
10/12/2018
Notice (Other)
33
10/12/2018
Notice (Other)
34
10/12/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
35
10/19/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
36
11/13/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
37
11/21/2018
Stipulation
11/26/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
12/10/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
40
12/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
42
01/08/2019
Notice (Other)
01/08/2019
Order - Ex Parte (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
01/09/2019
Order
44
01/18/2019
Stipulation
45
01/24/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines
46
02/04/2019
Notice of Settlement
02/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
02/20/2019
Stipulation of Dismissal
02/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.