Cortnie Lawrence Beasley and Eric Scott Beasley
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01436 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 251 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/03/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Cortnie Lawrence Beasley, Eric Scott Beasley
2
04/03/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Cortnie Lawrence Beasley, Joint Debtor Eric Scott Beasley.
4
04/03/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Debtor Cortnie Lawrence Beasley, Joint Debtor Eric Scott Beasley.
5
04/03/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Cortnie Lawrence Beasley, Joint Debtor Eric Scott Beasley.
6
04/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/09/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 06/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 06/12/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/01/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 07/09/2018.
7
04/03/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Cortnie Lawrence Beasley, Joint Debtor Eric Scott Beasley.
04/03/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01436-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21914046. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
04/04/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
04/04/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Cortnie Lawrence Beasley and Eric Scott Beasley Case Number 03-09986, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/12/2003; Case Number 03-09986, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/12/2003, Standard Discharge on 03/09/2004.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
04/04/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
10
04/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 04/05/2018.
11
04/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/06/2018.
12
04/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Cortnie Lawrence Beasley, Joint Debtor Eric Scott Beasley). Notice Date 04/06/2018.
13
04/09/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
14
05/08/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Americredit Financial Services, Inc.Dba GM Financial.
15
05/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 05/09/2018. (Ch13troffice, sd)
16
05/14/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
17
05/15/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
18
05/17/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Cortnie Lawrence Beasley, Joint Debtor Eric Scott Beasley (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Cortnie Lawrence Beasley, Joint Debtor Eric Scott Beasley.). (Shinn, J.)
19
05/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/17/2018.
20
05/25/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC. (RE: related document(s) 18 Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Cortnie Lawrence Beasley, Joint Debtor Eric Scott Beasley (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Cortnie Lawrence Beasley, Joint Debtor Eric Scott Beasley.). (Shinn, J.)).
21
05/29/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 20 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC.). Hearing scheduled 6/19/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
22
06/12/2018
Trustee's Withdrawal Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss.). (Ch13troffice, km)
23
06/14/2018
Consent Order Signed on 6/14/2018 (RE: related document(s) 20 Withdrawing Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC.).
24
06/14/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Cortnie Lawrence Beasley, Joint Debtor Eric Scott Beasley (RE: related document(s) 18 Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Cortnie Lawrence Beasley, Joint Debtor Eric Scott Beasley (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Cortnie Lawrence Beasley, Joint Debtor Eric Scott Beasley.). (Shinn, J.)). (Shinn, J.)
25
06/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Consent Order). Notice Date 06/16/2018.
26
06/20/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Confirmation Hearing. Hearing scheduled 07/17/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham
27
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 06/22/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.