Cox v. The Department of Veterans Affairs
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00226 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
30
06/13/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
31
06/14/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
32
06/19/2018
Witness List
33
07/25/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
34
07/27/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
35
08/23/2018
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
36
08/24/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
37
11/02/2018
Summary Judgment
38
11/21/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
39
11/28/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
12/14/2018
Docket Annotation re Non-Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
12/14/2018
Seal Document
45
12/14/2018
Affidavit - Sealed pdf
46
12/14/2018
Hearing
47
12/19/2018
Order on Motion to Seal Document
48
12/31/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing
49
01/31/2019
Order
50
02/27/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
51
02/28/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
52
03/07/2019
Strike
53
03/07/2019
Seal Document
03/07/2019
Docket Annotation re Combined Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
03/07/2019
Order on Motion to Seal Document
56
03/07/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
58
03/21/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
59
03/28/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
60
04/19/2019
Order
05/02/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
05/03/2019
ORDER granting 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 52 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/3/19.
63
05/06/2019
Judgment
64
05/10/2019
Bill of Costs

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.