Craig Goodbeer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80904 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
doc
05/21/2018
Withdraw Document
doc
05/22/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/22/2018
Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/05/2018
Installments Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.