Cristopher Yong Becker
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00058 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/03/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
doc
06/04/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
06/05/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
19
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
06/08/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.