Crockett et al v. NEA-Alaska et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00179 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/02/2018
Complaint
2
08/02/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
08/22/2018
Notice of Appearance
4
08/22/2018
Waiver of Service Executed
5
08/22/2018
Notice of Appearance
6
10/11/2018
Waiver of Service Executed
7
10/11/2018
Waiver of Service Executed
8
10/11/2018
Waiver of Service Executed
9
10/12/2018
Notice of Appearance
10
10/12/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
11
10/18/2018
Answer to Complaint
10/23/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
10/24/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
14
10/24/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
15
10/24/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
16
10/24/2018
Errata
17
10/25/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
18
10/25/2018
Affidavit
19
10/25/2018
Notice (Other)
20
10/25/2018
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
10/25/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
10/26/2018
Notice of Appearance
25
10/26/2018
Notice of Appearance
26
10/26/2018
Notice of Appearance
11/01/2018
Clerk's Notice of Deficiency (Proof of Service) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
11/05/2018
Unissued Summons
11/05/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
11/13/2018
Notice (Other)
30
11/13/2018
Dismiss
31
11/13/2018
Memorandum
11/14/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
11/13/2018
Declaration
33
11/13/2018
Declaration
35
11/15/2018
Affidavit of Service
36
11/27/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
37
11/27/2018
Affidavit
38
11/27/2018
Notice (Other)
39
11/27/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
40
11/27/2018
Affidavit
41
11/27/2018
Notice (Other)
42
11/29/2018
Notice of Appearance
11/30/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
12/04/2018
Amended Complaint
45
12/04/2018
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
46
12/04/2018
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
12/11/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
12/18/2018
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
50
12/18/2018
Memorandum
51
12/18/2018
Declaration
52
12/18/2018
Response to Order
53
12/18/2018
Dismiss
54
12/18/2018
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
12/19/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
01/08/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
57
01/08/2019
Response in Support of Motion
58
01/18/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
59
01/18/2019
Response in Support of Motion
60
01/23/2019
Hearing
01/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/27/2019
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/27/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/15/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/15/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
02/15/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
64
02/20/2019
Transcript
65
02/23/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
66
03/01/2019
Notice (Other)
67
03/12/2019
Notice (Other)
68
03/14/2019
ORDER granting 49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 53 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/14/19.
69
03/15/2019
Judgment
70
04/12/2019
Notice of Appeal
71
04/17/2019
USCA Case Number
72
04/17/2019
USCA Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.