Cruise Lines International Association Alaska et al v. The City and Borough of Juneau, Alaska et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2016-cv-00008 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
184
05/18/2018
Strike
185
05/18/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
186
05/24/2018
Order on Motion to Strike
187
05/24/2018
Order on Motion to Strike
188
05/24/2018
Order on Motion to Strike
189
05/24/2018
Order on Motion to Strike
190
06/06/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
191
06/13/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
192
06/13/2018
Declaration
193
06/19/2018
Notice (Other)
194
06/28/2018
Notice (Other)
195
08/13/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
196
08/17/2018
Response to Order
197
08/20/2018
Order
198
08/24/2018
Order
199
09/19/2018
Notice of Change of Address
200
09/21/2018
Leave to File Document
09/24/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
202
09/26/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
203
10/01/2018
Transcript
204
10/03/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
205
10/04/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
206
10/09/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
207
12/06/2018
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Summary Judgment and 118 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying in part 81 Motion to Determine Law. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 12/6/18.
208
12/06/2018
Order
209
12/14/2018
Notice (Other)
210
01/08/2019
Additional Related Document
211
01/10/2019
Notice (Other)
212
01/11/2019
Order
213
01/17/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
214
01/23/2019
Leave to File Document
215
01/24/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File
216
01/24/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
217
01/25/2019
Judgment
218
02/01/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
219
02/04/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
220
03/15/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
221
03/18/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.