Crystallex International Corp v. Petroleos de Venezuela sa, et al
Court Docket Sheet

2016-04012 (ca3)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 239 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
11/03/2016
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant PDV Holding Inc in District Court No. 1-15-cv-01082.
11/03/2016
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
11/17/2016
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey L. Moyer of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. on behalf of Appellee(s) Crystallex International Corp.
doc
11/17/2016
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Travis S. Hunter of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. on behalf of Appellee(s) Crystallex International Corp.
doc
11/17/2016
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Raymond J. DiCamillo of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. on behalf of Appellee(s) Crystallex International Corp.
doc
11/17/2016
ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Crystallex International Corp, filed.
doc
11/21/2016
FOLLOW UP LETTER to Kenneth J. Nachbar, Esq. for PDV Holding Inc and Petroleos de Venezuela SA and Citgo Holding Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 12/05/2016. Disclosure Statement on or before 12/05/2016. Information Statement on or before 12/05/2016. Concise Summary on or before 12/05/2016. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 12/05/2016.
doc
11/21/2016
FOLLOW UP LETTER to Samuel Taylor Hirzel, II, Esq. for Petroleos de Venezuela SA and Kenneth J. Nachbar, Esq. for Petroleos de Venezuela SA and Citgo Holding Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 12/05/2016. Disclosure Statement on or before 12/05/2016.
doc
12/05/2016
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kenneth J. Nachbar on behalf of Appellant(s) PDV Holding Inc.
doc
12/05/2016
ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc, filed.
doc
12/05/2016
ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc, filed.
doc
12/05/2016
ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant PDV Holding Inc, received.
doc
12/05/2016
ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant PDV Holding Inc advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court.
doc
12/12/2016
BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc due on or before 01/23/2017. Appendix due on or before 01/23/2017. VACATED per Clerk's Order of 12/23/16.--[Edited 12/23/2016 by SLC]
doc
12/23/2016
ORDER (Clerk) vacating briefing notice issued on 12/12/2016, filed.
doc
12/23/2016
ORDER (Clerk) directing an Answer to be filed. Answer due 01/06/2017.
doc
01/06/2017
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nathan P. Eimer on behalf of Appellant(s) PDV Holding, Inc.
doc
01/06/2017
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lisa S. Meyer on behalf of Appellant(s) PDV Holding, Inc.
doc
01/06/2017
ECF FILER: Show Cause Response filed by Attorney Kenneth J. Nachbar, Esq. for Appellant PDV Holding Inc and Not Parties Petroleos de Venezuela SA and Citgo Holding Inc.
doc
01/06/2017
ECF FILER: Show Cause Response filed by Attorney Travis S. Hunter, Esq. for Appellee Crystallex International Corp.
doc
01/13/2017
ORDER (Clerk) The appeal is stayed pending disposition of the petition for permission to appeal at No. 17-8001. Within 14 days of the date of the order disposing of the petition for permission to appeal, the parites should file responses addressing the status of the motion to dismiss filed in the District Court. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE TEXT, filed.
doc
02/23/2017
ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Nathan P. Eimer, Esq. for Appellant PDV Holding Inc Letter to the Court responding to Jan.13, 2017 Order. Certificate of Service dated 02/23/2017.
doc
02/24/2017
ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Travis S. Hunter, Esq. for Appellee Crystallex International Corp Letter regarding status report. Certificate of Service dated 02/24/2017.
doc
02/28/2017
CLERK ORDER consolidating the Appeals at Nos. 16-4012 and 17-1439 for all purposes, filed. [16-4012, 17-1439]
doc
02/28/2017
ORDER (Clerk) referring to a motions panel the letter repsonse from Appellant to Clerk's January 13, 2017 Order Staying Case, requesting that the case continue to be stayed and Letter Response from Appellee Crystallex International Corp. to Clerk's January 13, 2017 Order Staying Case, requesting that stay be lifted, filed. [16-4012, 17-1439]
doc
03/10/2017
ECF FILER: CORRECTED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc, filed.
doc
03/23/2017
ORDER (CHAGARES and VANASKIE, Circuit Judges) Appellee's request to lift the Clerk's 01/13/17 stay is GRANTED and Appellant's request that the stay be continued is DENIED, filed. Panel No.: DCO-054. VANASKIE, Authoring Judge. [16-4012, 17-1439]
doc
03/23/2017
BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc due on or before 05/02/2017. Appendix due on or before 05/02/2017. [16-4012, 17-1439]
doc
05/01/2017
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kenneth J. Nachbar on behalf of Appellant(s) PDV Holding Inc. [17-1439, 16-4012]
doc
05/02/2017
ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc in 16-4012, 17-1439, filed. Certificate of Service dated 05/02/2017 by ECF. [16-4012, 17-1439]
doc
05/02/2017
ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc in 16-4012, 17-1439, filed. Certificate of service dated 05/02/2017 by ECF. [16-4012, 17-1439]
05/05/2017
HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant PDV Holding Inc in 16-4012, 17-1439 - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 10. [16-4012, 17-1439] (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/05/2017
HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant PDV Holding Inc in 16-4012, 17-1439 - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 2 (Volume I attached to Brief). [16-4012, 17-1439] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/01/2017
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jason W. Myatt on behalf of Appellee(s) Crystallex International Corp. [16-4012, 17-1439]
doc
06/01/2017
ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Crystallex International Corp in 16-4012, 17-1439, filed. Certificate of Service dated 06/01/2017 by ECF. [16-4012, 17-1439]
06/02/2017
HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellee Crystallex International Corp in 16-4012, 17-1439 - Brief. Copies: 7. [16-4012, 17-1439] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/05/2017
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert L. Weigel on behalf of Appellee(s) Crystallex International Corp. [16-4012, 17-1439]
doc
06/15/2017
ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc in 16-4012, 17-1439, filed. Certificate of Service dated 06/15/2017 by ECF. [16-4012, 17-1439]
06/19/2017
HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant PDV Holding Inc in 16-4012, 17-1439 - Reply Brief. Copies: 7. Received: 10. [16-4012, 17-1439] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
07/21/2017
Calendared for Tuesday, 09/12/2017. (Rescheduled from Thursday, 09/14/2017.) Calendar Clerk: PM. [16-4012, 17-1439]--[Edited 08/23/2017 by TLG]
doc
07/27/2017
ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Robert L. Weigel, Esq. for Appellee Crystallex International Corp in 16-4012, 17-1439. Certificate of Service dated 07/27/2017. Service made by ECF. [16-4012, 17-1439]
doc
07/27/2017
ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Nathan P. Eimer, Esq. for Appellant PDV Holding Inc in 16-4012, 17-1439. Certificate of Service dated 07/27/2017. Service made by ECF. [16-4012, 17-1439]
doc
08/23/2017
Oral Argument Notification for Tuesday, 09/12/2017. Courtroom & Time: Maris Courtroom/10am. Location: Philadelphia, PA. [16-4012, 17-1439]
08/28/2017
ECF FILER: SUMMARY OF ORAL ARGUMENT submitted by Attorney Nathan P. Eimer, Esq. for Appellant PDV Holding Inc in 16-4012, 17-1439. Case Summary: Determining (1) the preemptive effect of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act on state fraudulent transfer claims involving immunized property and (2) whether Delawares fraudulent transfer statute may impose liability on non-debtor transferors. Post Video: YES. [16-4012, 17-1439] (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2017
ECF FILER: SUMMARY OF ORAL ARGUMENT submitted by Attorney Robert L. Weigel, Esq. for Appellee Crystallex International Corp in 16-4012, 17-1439. Case Summary: Whether Appellant can be held liable under Delawares Uniform Fraudulent Transfer Act for transferring assets belonging to Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A., a foreign sovereign instrumentality, out of the US with actual intent to hinder and delay creditors. Post Video: YES. [16-4012, 17-1439] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/29/2017
ECF FILER: Letter dated 08/29/2017, filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellant PDV Holding Inc in 16-4012, 17-1439. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [16-4012, 17-1439]
doc
09/01/2017
ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Crystallex International Corp in 16-4012, 17-1439 to Rule 28(j) letter. Certificate of Service dated 09/01/2017. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [16-4012, 17-1439]
09/12/2017
ARGUED on Tuesday, September 12, 2017. Panel: VANASKIE, RENDELL and FUENTES, Circuit Judges. Nathan P. Eimer arguing for Appellant PDV Holding Inc; Nathan P. Eimer arguing for Appellant PDV Holding Inc; Robert L. Weigel arguing for Appellee Crystallex International Corp; Robert L. Weigel arguing for Appellee Crystallex International Corp. [16-4012, 17-1439] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
09/13/2017
CLERK'S LETTER to counsel written at the direction of the Court. At the direction of the court, counsel are hereby directed to file a transcript of oral argument by Tuesday, September 26, 2017 in the above entitled case. Liaison counsel should immediately advise the Clerk's Office of the Court Reporter or agency handling the Transcription of oral argument. The parties shall divide the cost of the preparation of the transcript. (Please see letter attached for full text). [16-4012, 17-1439]
doc
09/26/2017
ECF FILER: Transcript of oral argument on 09/12/2017 prepared at the direction of the Court. [16-4012, 17-1439]
doc
01/03/2018
PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: VANASKIE, RENDELL and FUENTES, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 35. Judge: RENDELL Authoring, Judge: FUENTES Dissenting. [16-4012, 17-1439] (JK) [Entered: 01/03/2018 09:37 AM]
doc
01/03/2018
JUDGMENT, Reversed and Remanded. Costs taxed against Appellee.--[Edited 01/03/2018 by JK] [16-4012, 17-1439] (JK) [Entered: 01/03/2018 09:39 AM]
doc
01/17/2018
ECF FILER: BILL OF COSTS filed on behalf of Appellant PDV Holding Inc in 16-4012, 17-1439. Certificate of Service dated 01/17/2018. Service made by ECF. [16-4012, 17-1439] (NPE) [Entered: 01/17/2018 04:57 PM]
doc
01/17/2018
ECF FILER: Petition filed by Appellee Crystallex International Corp in 16-4012 for Rehearing before original panel and the court en banc. Certificate of Service dated 01/17/2018. Service made by ECF. [16-4012, 17-1439] (RLW) [Entered: 01/17/2018 11:26 PM]
doc
01/18/2018
REVIEWED & ADJUSTED Bill of Costs filed. After review, costs will be taxed in the amount of $626.70. [16-4012, 17-1439] (JK) [Entered: 01/18/2018 04:45 PM]
doc
02/05/2018
ORDER (SMITH, Chief Judge, MCKEE, AMBRO, CHAGARES, JORDAN, HARDIMAN, GREENAWAY JR., VANASKIE, SHWARTZ, KRAUSE, RESTREPO, BIBAS, RENDELL and FUENTES, Circuit Judges) denying Petition for En Banc and Panel Rehearing filed by Appellee Crystallex International Corp. Judge Restrepo voted for rehearing, filed. RENDELL, Authoring Judge. [16-4012, 17-1439] (JK) [Entered: 02/05/2018 10:33 AM]
doc
02/13/2018
MANDATE ISSUED, filed. [16-4012, 17-1439] (JK) [Entered: 02/13/2018 09:23 AM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.