Csiszer et al v. Wren et al
Court Docket Sheet

3:2008-cv-03011 (arwd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 325 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/30/2008
COMPLAINT against Continental Casualty Company, Perry L. Wilbur, M.D., Perry L Wilbur, M.D., P.A., Mary R. Wren, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC, Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 2001883.) filed by Rozanna Csiszer and Charles Csiszer.
01/30/2008
6 Summons Issued as to Continental Casualty Company, Perry L. Wilbur, M.D. Perry L Wilbur, M.D., P.A., Mary R. Wren, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC, Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc. and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
02/19/2008
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
3
03/03/2008
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Mary R. Wren, MD.
4
03/10/2008
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Hensley Smith on behalf of Continental Casualty Company, Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
5
03/10/2008
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Continental Casualty Company, Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
03/10/2008
TEXT ONLY ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Robert T. Dawson for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 10, 2008. (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
03/10/2008
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/2/2008. Final Scheduling Order issue date 6/10/2008. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2009 09:00 AM in Harrison -- 2nd flr (Rm 231) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 10, 2008.
7
03/11/2008
NOTICE of Appearance by R. T. Beard, III on behalf of Perry Wilbur, MD, Perry L. Wilbur, MDPA (Beard, R.)
8
03/11/2008
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Perry Wilbur, MD, Perry L. Wilbur, MDPA.(Beard, R.)
9
04/15/2008
***PLEASE DISREGARD. REFILED with appropriate signatures. Please see document 10. AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer. Continental Casualty Company served on 2/11/2008, answer due 3/3/2008; Perry Wilbur, MD served on 2/25/2008, answer due 3/17/2008; Perry L. Wilbur, MDPA served on 2/25/2008, answer due 3/17/2008; Mary R. Wren, MD served on 2/26/2008, answer due 3/17/2008; Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC served on 2/7/2008, answer due 2/27/2008; Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc. served on 2/26/2008, answer due 3/17/2008. Modified on 4/15/2008 to add docket text and filer information
10
04/15/2008
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
11
06/02/2008
NOTICE of Appearance by Jory D. Lange on behalf of Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer
12
06/02/2008
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
13
06/04/2008
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/22/2008. Motions due by 12/22/2008. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2009 09:00 AM in Harrison -- 2nd flr (Rm 231) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on June 4, 2008.
1
Exhibit and Witness List)(mop
1 Attachment
14
06/18/2008
NOTICE by Perry Wilbur, MD, Perry L. Wilbur, MDPA Of Filing Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Beard, R.)
15
06/18/2008
NOTICE by Continental Casualty Company, Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc. OF RULE 26(A) INITIAL DISCLOSURES
16
08/14/2008
NOTICE of Appearance by Ken Cook on behalf of Perry Wilbur, MD, Perry L. Wilbur, MDPA
17
08/21/2008
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
1
Exhibit A - Articles of Incorporation
2
Exhibit B - USDC ED Ark Order re: Charitable Immunity
3
Exhibit C - USDC ED Ark Order re: Summary Judgment
3 Attachments
18
08/21/2008
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
19
08/21/2008
MOTION for Protective Order by Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
1
Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order
1 Attachment
20
08/21/2008
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 19 MOTION for Protective Order by Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
21
08/21/2008
STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
22
09/02/2008
RESPONSE to Motion re 19 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
23
09/08/2008
MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Baxter Regional Hospital by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
24
09/08/2008
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 23 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Baxter Regional Hospital by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit A, 08/05/08 Baxter RFP Responses
2
Exhibit B, 08/05/08 Baxter Interrogatory Responses
3
Exhibit C, 06/26/08 ltr from Laura Smith
3 Attachments
25
09/11/2008
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 11, 2008.
26
09/11/2008
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 11, 2008.
27
09/18/2008
RESPONSE to Motion re 23 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Baxter Regional Hospital filed by Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
28
09/18/2008
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 27 Response to Motion to Compel Discovery Responses by Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
29
10/27/2008
MOTION to Compel the Depositions of Baxter Regional Hospital Personnel by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit 1, October 9 letter to Laura Smith
2
Exhibit October 24 letter to Laura Smith
3
Exhibit 3, Deposition of Angela Padgett
4
Exhibit 4, Deposition of Mary Wren
5
Exhibit 5, Deposition of Barbara Bremer
5 Attachments
30
10/30/2008
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 23 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Baxter Regional Hospital filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer, and 29 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of Baxter Regional Hospital Personnel filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 30, 2008. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.
31
10/30/2008
MOTION to Compel Defendant CCC to Permit Inspection and Photographing of Premises by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit 1, Request to Enter, Inspect and Photograph Premises
2
Exhibit 2, Response to Request to Enter, Inspect and Photograph Premises
2 Attachments
32
10/31/2008
ORDER REFERRING : 31 MOTION to Compel Defendant CCC to Permit Inspection and Photographing of Premises filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 31, 2008. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.
33
11/11/2008
MOTION to Compel by Continental Casualty Company, Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
34
11/11/2008
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 33 MOTION to Compel by Continental Casualty Company, Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
35
11/11/2008
RESPONSE to Motion re 29 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of Baxter Regional Hospital Personnel filed by Continental Casualty Company, Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
36
11/12/2008
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 33 MOTION to Compel filed by Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc., Continental Casualty Company. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 12, 2008. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski for disposition or recommendation, whichever is appropriate. lw) Modified to edit text on 11/12/2008
37
11/12/2008
ORDER Setting/Resetting Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 1/13/2009 01:00 PM in Harrison -- 2nd flr (Rm 231) before Honorable James R. Marschewski. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 12, 2008.
38
11/13/2008
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc. and Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 13, 2008.
39
11/13/2008
RESPONSE to Motion re 31 MOTION to Compel Defendant CCC to Permit Inspection and Photographing of Premises filed by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
40
11/13/2008
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 29 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of Baxter Regional Hospital Personnel by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit 1-Expert Report of Eagon, RN
2
Exhibit 2-Expert Report of Dr. Harlass
3
Exhibit Letter dated 4-28-08
4
Exhibit 4-Letter dated 5-23-08
5
Exhibit 5-Letter dated 7-18-08
5 Attachments
41
11/14/2008
NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: 31 MOTION to Compel Defendant CCC to Permit Inspection and Photographing of Premises; 29 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of Baxter Regional Hospital Personnel; 23 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Baxter Regional Hospital; 33 MOTION to Compel : Motions Hearing set for 11/19/2008 10:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 2nd flr (Rm 226) before Honorable James R. Marschewski.
42
11/17/2008
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
43
11/18/2008
MOTION to Dismiss Party Perry L. Wilbur, M.D. and Perry L. Wilbur, M.D., P.A. by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit Proposed Order
1 Attachment
44
11/18/2008
RESPONSE to Motion re 33 MOTION to Compel filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
3 Attachments
11/19/2008
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable James R. Marschewski: Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2008 re 42 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC, 23 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Baxter Regional Hospital filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer, 33 MOTION to Compel filed by Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc., Continental Casualty Company, 29 MOTION to Compel the Depositions of Baxter Regional Hospital Personnel filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer, 31 MOTION to Compel Defendant CCC to Permit Inspection and Photographing of Premises filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer; no testimony given; order to follow. (Court Reporter - Maddox) (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
11/25/2008
ORDER re: 31 Motion to Compel; 33 Motion to Compel; 23 Motion to Compel; and 29 Motion to Compel as set forth. Further granting 42 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,that the Defendant's deadline for deposing experts is hereby extended to 1/19/09 and Plaintiff's are given 21 days from the date of receipt of the slides and tissue samples to obtain an expert report from their expert(s). Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 25, 2008.
46
12/09/2008
ORDER granting 43 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Perry Wilbur, MD and Perry L. Wilbur, MDPA, only. Perry Wilbur, MD and Perry L. Wilbur, MDPA terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 9, 2008.
47
12/10/2008
ORDER re: 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. The court has reviewed the documents in camera and finds that the document are protected by the peer review provisions of Ark. Code. Ann. Section 16-46-105 and that the Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Request for Production numbers 3,4 and 45 is hereby DENIED with regards to the documents provided to the court for in camera review. The documents are furthered order to be sealed by the clerk and subject to review only by the court. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 10, 2008. (lw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2017: # 1 Sealed Document)
48
12/11/2008
NOTICE by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer Rebuttal Expert Designation
1
Exhibit 1 - CV of Dr. Hermansen
2
Exhibit 2 - Hermansen's Report
2 Attachments
49
12/22/2008
MOTION to Quash Portions of Notices to Take Depositions by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
1
Exhibit A (Dr. Boehm's Deposition Notice)
2
Exhibit B (Deposition Notice for Dr. Redline)
2 Attachments
50
12/22/2008
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 49 MOTION to Quash Portions of Notices to Take Depositions by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
51
12/23/2008
ORDER REFERRING 49 MOTION to Quash Portions of Notices to Take Depositions filed by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 23, 2008. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.
52
12/30/2008
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
53
12/31/2008
ORDER granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Discovery deadline is extended through 1/30/2009. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 31, 2008.
54
01/05/2009
Emergency MOTION to Compel Depositions by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
6 Attachments
55
01/05/2009
ORDER REFERRING 54 Emergency MOTION to Compel Depositions filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 5, 2009. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.
56
01/06/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 54 Emergency MOTION to Compel Depositions filed by Continental Casualty Company.
57
01/07/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 54 Emergency MOTION to Compel Depositions filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit A - Manning Scheduling Order
2
Exhibit B - Motion to Continue
3
Exhibit C - Defendant's Response
4
Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' Reply to Response
4 Attachments
58
01/08/2009
Joint MOTION to Continue by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
59
01/08/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Opposition to 57 Reply to Response to Motion, Exhibit A supplement by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
60
01/08/2009
ORDER granting nos. 5, 6, 9, 11, 15, 16, 17, denying nos. 19, 20, 21, 22 and finding as moot nos. 8, 14, 49 Motion to Quash; as set forth. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 8, 2009.
01/09/2009
CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendants Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC. Motion to Continue 58 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: James R. Estes. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
01/09/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 58 Joint MOTION to Continue filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
62
01/09/2009
ORDER denying 58 Motion to Continue. This matter remains set for jury trial the week beginning 2/9/09 at 9:00 AM Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 9, 2009.
63
01/09/2009
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit Witness List
2
Exhibit Exhibit List
2 Attachments
64
01/09/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Estes, Jr on behalf of Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC
65
01/09/2009
MOTION to Quash Notice of Deposition by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
66
01/11/2009
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Continental Casualty Company.
67
01/11/2009
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
68
01/12/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 65 MOTION to Quash Notice of Deposition filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit A -Dr. Ashkenasi's Report
2
Exhibit B - Dr. Rohrbaugh's Report
2 Attachments
69
01/13/2009
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 65 MOTION to Quash Notice of Deposition filed by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC, for disposition or recommendation. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 13, 2009. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.
01/13/2009
TEXT ONLY ORDER denying 65 Motion to Quash. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 13, 2009. (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
01/14/2009
ORDER denying plaintiff's Emergency 54 Motion to Compel as moot. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 14, 2009.
71
01/15/2009
MOTION of Jory D. Lange, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
72
01/16/2009
ORDER granting 71 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff. Jory D. Lange, Jr terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 16, 2009.
73
01/16/2009
MOTION in Limine by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
74
01/16/2009
MOTION for Consideration to Allow Complete Voir Dire and to Use Questionnaire by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit A - form questionnaire
2
Exhibit B - case specific questionnaire
2 Attachments
75
01/19/2009
MOTION in Limine Regarding Medical Expenses by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
76
01/19/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 75 MOTION in Limine Regarding Medical Expenses by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit 1 - Act 649
2
Exhibit 2 - Transcript of Debate on HB 1038
2 Attachments
77
01/19/2009
***PLEASE DISREGARD. WRONG PDF ATTACHED. PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT 80. MOTION in Limine Regarding the Standard of Care by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer. Modified on 1/20/2009 to add docket text
78
01/19/2009
***DOCUMENT REFILED TO PROPERLY LINK TO MOTION. Please see document 81. MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 77 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Standard of Care by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer. Modified on 1/20/2009 to add docket text
79
01/20/2009
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 2/4/2009 at 10:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 1st flr (Rm 1004) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. (mop) Modified on 1/21/2009 to correct hearing date
80
01/20/2009
MOTION in Limine Regarding the Standard of Care by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
81
01/20/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 80 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Standard of Care by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
82
01/20/2009
Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Continental Casualty Company, Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
83
01/20/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 82 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Continental Casualty Company, Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc.
84
01/20/2009
ORDER REFERRING 82 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Baxter County Regional Hospital, Inc., Continental Casualty Company. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 20, 2009. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.
85
01/20/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 82 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
86
01/21/2009
MOTION in Limine with Authorities in Support by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
87
01/21/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 82 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Continental Casualty Company.
88
01/22/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 86 MOTION in Limine with Authorities in Support by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
89
01/22/2009
MOTION for Consideration of Jury Panel of at Least Ninety Venire Persons by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
90
01/22/2009
ORDER denying as moot 82 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 22, 2009.
91
01/23/2009
MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defense Experts by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
92
01/23/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 91 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defense Experts by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
93
01/23/2009
OBJECTION(S) by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer re 66 Pretrial Disclosure Sheet, 67 Pretrial Disclosure Sheet.
94
01/23/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 92 Memorandum Brief in Support Appendix 1 of 9 by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
95
01/23/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support Appendix Part 2 of 9 by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
96
01/23/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 92 Memorandum Brief in Support Appendix Part 3a of 9 by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
97
01/23/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 92 Memorandum Brief in Support Appendix Part 3b of 9 by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
98
01/23/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 92 Memorandum Brief in Support Appendix Part 4 of 9 by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
99
01/23/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 92 Memorandum Brief in Support Appendix Part 5 of 9 by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
100
01/23/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 92 Memorandum Brief in Support Appendix Part 6 of 9 by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
101
01/23/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 92 Memorandum Brief in Support Appendix Part 7a of 9 by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
102
01/23/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 92 Memorandum Brief in Support Appendix Part 7b of 9 by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
103
01/23/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 92 Memorandum Brief in Support Appendix Part 8 of 9 by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
104
01/23/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 92 Memorandum Brief in Support Appendix Part 9a of 9 by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
105
01/23/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 92 Memorandum Brief in Support Appendix Part 9b of 9 by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
106
01/23/2009
MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Having Two Videographers at the Deposition of Dr. Redline by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
107
01/24/2009
MOTION in Limine Regarding Experts by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
108
01/24/2009
Second MOTION in Limine Regarding Experts by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
109
01/25/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 106 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Having Two Videographers at the Deposition of Dr. Redline filed by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
110
01/26/2009
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 106 for Protective Order Regarding Having Two Videographers at the Deposition of Dr. Redline filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer, for disposition or recommendation. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 26, 2009. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.
111
01/26/2009
ORDER denying 106 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Having Two Videographers at the Deposition of Dr. Redline. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 26, 2009.
112
01/26/2009
MOTION in Limine Joining Motion in Limine With Authorities in Support filed by Co-Defendants Dr. Wren and Wren & Barrow by Continental Casualty Company.
113
01/26/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 89 MOTION for Consideration of Jury Panel of at Least Ninety Venire Persons filed by Continental Casualty Company.
114
01/26/2009
MOTION in Limine To Exclude "Day in the Life" Video Provided by Plaintiffs on January 22, 2009 by Continental Casualty Company. Modified on 1/30/2009 to create relationship to Memorandum Brief 149
115
01/26/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 73 MOTION in Limine (Joint Response) filed by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
1
Exhibit A (Deposition of Dr. Mendoza)
1 Attachment
116
01/26/2009
MOTION in Limine to Prevent Plaintiffs From Calling Margie Swanson, Amy Myers, Caron Alexander, Margaret Fielding, Cindy Davenport, Dr. Kerr and Mr. Erickson to Testify at Trial by Continental Casualty Company.
117
01/26/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 116 MOTION in Limine to Prevent Plaintiffs From Calling Margie Swanson, Amy Myers, Caron Alexander, Margaret Fielding, Cindy Davenport, Dr. Kerr and Mr. Erickson to Testify at Trial by Continental Casualty Company.
118
01/26/2009
MOTION in Limine To Exclude Medical Records and Radiological Films From St. Louis Children's Hospital or, in the Alternative, Motion to Redepose Plaintiffs and Other Pertinent Witnesses by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
119
01/26/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 118 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Medical Records and Radiological Films From St. Louis Children's Hospital or, in the Alternative, Motion to Redepose Plaintiffs and Other Pertinent Witnesses by Continental Casualty Company.
120
01/26/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 74 MOTION for Consideration to Allow Complete Voir Dire and to Use Questionnaire Joint Response of Defendants filed by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
121
01/26/2009
MOTION in Limine To Prevent Plaintiffs From Calling Bethany Underwood, Ann Cisco, Amy Mueller and Tamora Elting To Testify at Trial by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
122
01/26/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 121 MOTION in Limine To Prevent Plaintiffs From Calling Bethany Underwood, Ann Cisco, Amy Mueller and Tamora Elting To Testify at Trial by Continental Casualty Company.
123
01/26/2009
MOTION in Limine To Exclude Video Footage From St. Louis Children's Hospital or, in the Alternative, Motion to Redepose Plaintiffs and Other Pertinent Witnesses by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
124
01/26/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 123 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Video Footage From St. Louis Children's Hospital or, in the Alternative, Motion to Redepose Plaintiffs and Other Pertinent Witnesses by Continental Casualty Company.
125
01/26/2009
MOTION in Limine To Prevent Plaintiffs From Calling Sheila Knuckles, Ann Jones and Barbara Bremer To Testify at Trial by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
126
01/26/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 125 MOTION in Limine To Prevent Plaintiffs From Calling Sheila Knuckles, Ann Jones and Barbara Bremer To Testify at Trial by Continental Casualty Company.
127
01/26/2009
MOTION in Limine To Exclude Photographs Provided by Plaintiffs or, in the alternative, Motion to Redepose Plaintiffs by Continental Casualty Company.
1
INDEX OF EXHIBIT A
2
Photos 1-6
3
Photos 7-12
4
Photos 13-18
5
Photos 19-24
6
Photos 25-27
6 Attachments
128
01/26/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 127 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Photographs Provided by Plaintiffs or, in the alternative, Motion to Redepose Plaintiffs by Continental Casualty Company.
129
01/28/2009
MOTION in Limine - Vicarious Liability for Defendant Dr. Wren by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Exhibit A - Deposition of Dr. Wren
2
Exhibit B - Insurance Policy
2 Attachments
130
01/28/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 129 MOTION in Limine - Vicarious Liability for Defendant Dr. Wren by Continental Casualty Company.
131
01/28/2009
MOTION in Limine - Punitive Damages and Alternative Motion for Bifurcation by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Exhibit A - Deposition of Dr. Harlass
2
Exhibit B - DEPOSITION OF DR. ASHKENASI
3
Exhibit C - DEPOSITION OF DR. NAIDICH
4
Exhibit D - DEPOSITION OF NURSE EAGON
5
Exhibit E - DEPOSITION OF DR. HERMANSEN
5 Attachments
132
01/28/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 131 MOTION in Limine - Punitive Damages and Alternative Motion for Bifurcation by Continental Casualty Company.
133
01/28/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 75 MOTION in Limine Regarding Medical Expenses filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit Attorney General's Response Letter
1 Attachment
134
01/28/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 107 MOTION in Limine Regarding Experts filed by Continental Casualty Company.
135
01/28/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 108 Second MOTION in Limine Regarding Experts filed by Continental Casualty Company.
136
01/29/2009
CERTIFICATE; that the constitutionality of section 15(b) of Act 649 of 2003, codified at section 16-114-208(a) (1) (B) of the Arkansas Code, is drawn in question in this case, to which neither the State of Arkansas, nor any agency of the State of Arkansas, nor any officer or employee of the State of Arkansas, is a party. (cc: Dustin McDaniel) Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 29, 2009.
137
01/29/2009
CERTIFICATE; that the constitutionality of section 16-114-207 of the Arkansas Code, is drawn in question in this case, to which neither the State of Arkansas, nor any agency of the State of Arkansas, nor any officer or employee of the State of Arkansas, is a party. (cc: Dustin McDaniel). Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 29, 2009.
138
01/29/2009
MOTION in Limine -Opinion Testimony From This Defendant by Continental Casualty Company.
139
01/29/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 138 Motion in Limine - Opinion Testimony From This Defendant by Continental Casualty Company. Modified on 1/30/2009 to add document number(lw). Modified on 1/30/2009 to create document relationship
140
01/29/2009
MOTION for Order For A Jury of Twelve Persons by Continental Casualty Company.
141
01/29/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 140 MOTION for Order For A Jury of Twelve Persons by Continental Casualty Company.
142
01/29/2009
RESPONSE by Continental Casualty Company re 93 Objection(s) of Plaintiffs to Pretrial Disclosures of Defendants.
143
01/29/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 75 MOTION in Limine Regarding Medical Expenses (Joint Response) filed by Continental Casualty Company, Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
144
01/29/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 80 MOTION in Limine Regarding the Standard of Care filed by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
145
01/30/2009
MOTION for Twelve Person Jury by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
146
01/30/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 145 MOTION for Twelve Person Jury by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
147
01/30/2009
RESPONSE by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC re 93 Objection(s).
148
01/30/2009
AMENDED CERTIFICATE: re 136 Certificate, that the constitutionality of section 15(b)of Act 649 of 2003, codified at section 16-55-212 of the ArkansasCode, is drawn in question in this case, to whichneither the State of Arkansas, nor any agency of the State ofArkansas, nor any officer or employee of the State of Arkansas, is a party. (cc: Dustin McDaniel) Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 30, 2009.
149
01/30/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 114 Motion in Limine to Exclude "Day in the Life" Video Provided by Plaintiffs on January 22, 2009 by Continental Casualty Company. Modified on 1/30/2009 to create document relationship
150
01/30/2009
MOTION in Limine Re Records From Baxter Regional Medical Center to Be Used at Trial by Continental Casualty Company.
151
01/30/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 150 MOTION in Limine Re Records From Baxter Regional Medical Center to Be Used at Trial by Continental Casualty Company.
152
01/30/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 107 MOTION in Limine Regarding Experts filed by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
153
01/30/2009
MOTION in Limine by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
154
01/30/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 108 Second MOTION in Limine Regarding Experts filed by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
155
01/30/2009
OBJECTION(S) by Continental Casualty Company re 63 Pretrial Disclosure Sheet of Plaintiffs.
156
01/30/2009
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
157
01/30/2009
MOTION in Limine (Joining Motion in Limine -Punitive Damages and Alternatively Motion for Bifurcation filed by Continental Casualty Company by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
158
01/30/2009
MOTION in Limine (Joining Motion in Limine to Exclude Medical Records and Radiological Films From St. Louis Children's Hospital and Motion in Limine to Exclude Video Footage from St. Louis Children's Hospital by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
159
01/30/2009
MOTION in Limine (Joining Motion in Limine to Exclude Photographs Provided by Plaintiffs by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
1
Exhibit B
1 Attachment
160
01/30/2009
MOTION in Limine (Joining Motion in Limine on Opinion Testimony of Defendant by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
161
01/30/2009
OBJECTION(S) by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC re 63 Pretrial Disclosure Sheet.
162
01/30/2009
ORDER granting permission for Louis S. Hakim to proceed pro hac vice in this case and further directing that he immediately register as as CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and to enter an apperance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 30, 2009.
163
01/30/2009
MOTION in Limine - Same Specialty Limitation by Continental Casualty Company.
164
01/30/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 163 MOTION in Limine - Same Specialty Limitation by Continental Casualty Company.
165
01/30/2009
MOTION in Limine - General Issues by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Exhibit A-Portions of Nurse Padgett's Deposition
2
Exhibit B-Portions of Dr. Boehm's Deposition
2 Attachments
166
01/30/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 165 MOTION in Limine - General Issues by Continental Casualty Company.
167
01/30/2009
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Photographs of Birth Provided by Plaintiffs or, in the Alternative, Motion to Redepose Plaintiffs by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Exhibit A-Photographs
2
Exhibit B-Plaintiffs' Responses/Objections to Requests for Production
2 Attachments
168
01/30/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 167 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Photographs of Birth Provided by Plaintiffs or, in the Alternative, Motion to Redepose Plaintiffs by Continental Casualty Company.
169
01/30/2009
MOTION in Limine to Prevent Plaintiffs from Calling Nicole Cousins to Testify at Trial by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Exhibit A-Portions of Nicole Cousins' Deposition
1 Attachment
170
01/30/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 169 MOTION in Limine to Prevent Plaintiffs from Calling Nicole Cousins to Testify at Trial by Continental Casualty Company.
171
01/30/2009
MOTION in Limine (Joining Motion in Limine-General Issues) by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
172
01/30/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 91 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defense Experts filed by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Appendix Index
2
Exhibit A part 1
3
Exhibit A part 2
4
Exhibit A part 3
4 Attachments
173
01/30/2009
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Allegations Against Baxter Regional Medical Center Other than for Negligence Under a Theory of Respondeat Superior by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Exhibit A-Portions of Janine Eagon Deposition
2
Exhibit B-Portions of Dr. Harlass Deposition
3
Exhibit C-Portions of Angela Padgett Deposition
3 Attachments
174
01/30/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 173 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Allegations Against Baxter Regional Medical Center Other than for Negligence Under a Theory of Respondeat Superior by Continental Casualty Company.
175
01/31/2009
RESPONSE to Motion Regarding Punitive Damages filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
176
02/02/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Plaintiffs' 73 Motion in Limine, Item 11.02 by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit 1 - Wren deposition
2
Exhibit 2 - Wilbur deposition
3
Exhibit 3 - Redline deposition
4
Exhibit 4 - Mendoza deposition) Modified on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="02/03/2020" time="">2/3/20</a>09 to add document number(lw
4 Attachments
177
02/02/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 169 MOTION in Limine to Prevent Plaintiffs from Calling Nicole Cousins to Testify at Trial filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
178
02/02/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 121 MOTION in Limine To Prevent Plaintiffs From Calling Bethany Underwood, Ann Cisco, Amy Mueller and Tamora Elting To Testify at Trial filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
179
02/02/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 74 MOTION for Consideration to Allow Complete Voir Dire and to Use Questionnaire filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
180
02/02/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 108 Second MOTION in Limine Regarding Experts filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
181
02/02/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 107 MOTION in Limine Regarding Experts filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
182
02/02/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 112 MOTION in Limine Joining Motion in Limine With Authorities in Support filed by Co-Defendants Dr. Wren and Wren & Barrow filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
183
02/02/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 125 MOTION in Limine To Prevent Plaintiffs From Calling Sheila Knuckles, Ann Jones and Barbara Bremer To Testify at Trial filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
184
02/02/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 116 MOTION in Limine to Prevent Plaintiffs From Calling Margie Swanson, Amy Myers, Caron Alexander, Margaret Fielding, Cindy Davenport, Dr. Kerr and Mr. Erickson to Testify at Trial filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
185
02/02/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 118 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Medical Records and Radiological Films From St. Louis Children's Hospital or, in the Alternative, Motion to Redepose Plaintiffs and Other Pertinent Witnesses filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit 1 - Medical Records from St. Louis Children's Hospital
1 Attachment
186
02/02/2009
RESPONSE to Motion regarding Video Footage from St. Louis Children's Hospital filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
187
02/02/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Hakim on behalf of Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer
188
02/02/2009
*** PLEASE DISREGARD SEE 190 *** MOTION in Limine Regarding Expert Raymond Redline, M.D. by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit 1 - deposition of Dr. Redline) Modified on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="02/03/2020" time="">2/3/20</a>09 to add text (lw
1 Attachment
189
02/02/2009
MOTION in Limine Regarding Expert Janine Eagon by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
190
02/02/2009
Amended MOTION in Limine regarding Raymond Redline by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit 1 - Redline's Deposition
1 Attachment
191
02/02/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 129 MOTION in Limine - Vicarious Liability for Defendant Dr. Wren filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
192
02/02/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 167 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Photographs of Birth Provided by Plaintiffs or, in the Alternative, Motion to Redepose Plaintiffs filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
193
02/02/2009
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William A. Newman by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
194
02/02/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 89 MOTION for Consideration of Jury Panel of at Least Ninety Venire Persons filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
195
02/02/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 114 MOTION in Limine To Exclude "Day in the Life" Video Provided by Plaintiffs on January 22, 2009 filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
196
02/02/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 125 MOTION in Limine To Prevent Plaintiffs From Calling Sheila Knuckles, Ann Jones and Barbara Bremer To Testify at Trial filed by Continental Casualty Company.
197
02/02/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 121 MOTION in Limine To Prevent Plaintiffs From Calling Bethany Underwood, Ann Cisco, Amy Mueller and Tamora Elting To Testify at Trial filed by Continental Casualty Company.
198
02/02/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 116 MOTION in Limine to Prevent Plaintiffs From Calling Margie Swanson, Amy Myers, Caron Alexander, Margaret Fielding, Cindy Davenport, Dr. Kerr and Mr. Erickson to Testify at Trial filed by Continental Casualty Company.
199
02/02/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defense Experts filed by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
1
Exhibit B
2
Exhibit C
2 Attachments
200
02/02/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 169 MOTION in Limine to Prevent Plaintiffs from Calling Nicole Cousins to Testify at Trial filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
201
02/03/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 190 Amended MOTION in Limine regarding Raymond Redline filed by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
202
02/03/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 131 MOTION in Limine - Punitive Damages and Alternative Motion for Bifurcation filed by Continental Casualty Company.
1
Exhibit A-H
1 Attachment
203
02/03/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 129 MOTION in Limine - Vicarious Liability for Defendant Dr. Wren filed by Continental Casualty Company.
204
02/03/2009
MOTION to Continue by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
205
02/03/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 204 MOTION to Continue by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
206
02/03/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 91 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defense Experts filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
207
02/03/2009
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Wells on behalf of Continental Casualty Company
208
02/03/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 165 MOTION in Limine - General Issues filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
209
02/03/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 138 MOTION in Limine -Opinion Testimony From This Defendant filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
210
02/03/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 138 MOTION in Limine -Opinion Testimony From This Defendant Supplemental filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Affidavit Aff of Susan Shott, Ph.D.
1 Attachment
211
02/03/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 150 MOTION in Limine Re Records From Baxter Regional Medical Center to Be Used at Trial filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
212
02/03/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 163 MOTION in Limine - Same Specialty Limitation Supplemental filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
213
02/03/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 163 MOTION in Limine - Same Specialty Limitation filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
214
02/03/2009
REPLY to Response to Motion re 86 MOTION in Limine with Authorities in Support filed by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
215
02/03/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 204 MOTION to Continue filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
216
02/03/2009
MOTION to Strike 210 Reply to Response to Motion (Supplement to Plaintiffs' Reply) by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
217
02/03/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 216 MOTION to Strike 210 Reply to Response to Motion (Supplement to Plaintiffs' Reply) by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
218
02/03/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 216 MOTION to Strike 210 Reply to Response to Motion (Supplement to Plaintiffs' Reply) filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
219
02/03/2009
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Items Appearing on Plaintiffs Pre-Trial Exhibit List by Continental Casualty Company.
220
02/03/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 219 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Items Appearing on Plaintiffs Pre-Trial Exhibit List by Continental Casualty Company.
221
02/04/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 169 MOTION in Limine to Prevent Plaintiffs from Calling Nicole Cousins to Testify at Trial filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
222
02/04/2009
APPENDIX by Plaintiffs Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer Part A.
223
02/04/2009
APPENDIX by Plaintiffs Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer Part B.
224
02/04/2009
APPENDIX by Plaintiffs Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer Part C.
225
02/04/2009
APPENDIX by Defendant Continental Casualty Company re 173 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Allegations Against Baxter Regional Medical Center Other than for Negligence Under a Theory of Respondeat Superior, 174 Memorandum Brief in Support.
1
Exhibit -Deposition of Nurse Eagon
1 Attachment
226
02/04/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 173 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Allegations Against Baxter Regional Medical Center Other than for Negligence Under a Theory of Respondeat Superior filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit A - Janine Eagon's Report
1 Attachment
227
02/04/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Robert T. Dawson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/4/2009. (Court Reporter Rick Congdon)(Tape No. Fort Smith)
228
02/05/2009
ORDER as set forth granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion in Limine; denying 74 Motion for Consideration.; denying 75 Motion in Limine; denying 80 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion in Limine; denying 89 Motion for Consideration.; denying 91 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion in Limine; denying 108 Motion in Limine; granting 114 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion in Limine; granting 118 Motion in Limine; denying 121 Motion in Limine; granting 123 Motion in Limine; denying 125 Motion in Limine; denying 127 Motion in Limine; granting 129 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion in Limine; granting 138 Motion in Limine; granting 140 Motion for Order; granting 145 Motion for Twelve Person Jury; denying 150 Motion in Limine; granting 163 Motion in Limine; denying 165 Motion in Limine; granting 167 Motion in Limine; denying 169 Motion in Limine; granting 173 Motion in Limine; denying 189 Motion in Limine; denying 190 Motion in Limine; denying 204 Motion to Continue; denying 216 Motion to Strike ; denying 219 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 5, 2009.
229
02/05/2009
MOTION to Strike Wren's Supplemental Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
1
Exhibit 1, Wren Supplemental Answers to Plf's First Set of Interrogatories
1 Attachment
230
02/06/2009
SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiffs Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer Briefing for Attorney Participation in Voir Dire 74.
1
Exhibit A - Andreano article
2
Exhibit B - Jones' article) Modified on <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="02/09/2020" time="">2/9/20</a>09 to add document number (lw
2 Attachments
231
02/09/2009
MOTION for Reconsideration re 164 Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion in Limine -- Same Specialty Limitations by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
232
02/09/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 231 MOTION for Reconsideration re 164 Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion in Limine -- Same Specialty Limitations by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
233
02/09/2009
MOTION to Declare Same Specialty Limitation Contained in Ark. Code Ann. 16-114-206 (ACT 649) Unconstitutional by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
234
02/09/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 233 MOTION to Declare Same Specialty Limitation Contained in Ark. Code Ann. 16-114-206 (ACT 649) Unconstitutional by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
235
02/09/2009
MOTION to Equalize Peremptory Challenges by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
236
02/09/2009
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 235 MOTION to Equalize Peremptory Challenges by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
237
02/09/2009
CERTIFICATE; that the constitutionality of section 16-114-206 of the Arkansas Code, is drawn in question in the above captioned case, to which neither the State of Arkansas, nor any agency of the State of Arkansas, nor any officer or employee of the State of Arkansas, is a party. (cc: Dustin McDaniel) Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 9, 2009. (lw) Modified on 2/9/2009 to correct text
238
02/09/2009
ORDER denying 229 Motion to Strike, denying 231 MOTION for Reconsideration of separate defendant Continental Casualty Company for Baxter Regional Medical Center's Motion in Limine, Same Specialty Limitation, and denying, 233 MOTION to Declare Same Specialty Limitation Contained in Ark. Code Ann. 16-114-206 (ACT 649) Unconstitutional, and granting 235 Motion to Equalize Peremptory Challenges. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 9, 2009.
239
02/09/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Robert T. Dawson: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 2/9/2009. (Court Reporter Rick Congdon)(Tape No. Fort Smith)
240
02/10/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Robert T. Dawson: Jury Selection held on 2/10/2009. Jury Trial (Day One) held on 2/10/2009. (Court Reporter Rick Congdon)(Tape No. Fort Smith)
241
02/11/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Robert T. Dawson: Jury Trial (Day Two) held on 2/11/2009. (Court Reporter Rick Congdon)(Tape No. Fort Smith)
242
02/12/2009
Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Honorable Robert T. Dawson: Jury Trial Day (3) held on 2/12/2009. (Court Reporter Rick Congdon.) (sh) Modified on 2/19/2009 to edit file date
243
02/13/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Robert T. Dawson: Jury Trial day (4) held on 2/13/2009. (Court Reporter Rick Congdon) (sh) Modified on 2/19/2009 to edit file date
244
02/16/2009
***PLEASE DISREGARD. INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED. Please see document 245. ***Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Robert T. Dawson: Jury Trial (Day Five) held on 2/16/2009. (Court Reporter Rick Congdon)(Tape No. Fort Smith) (mop) Modified on 2/18/2009 to add docket text
245
02/16/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Robert T. Dawson: Jury Trial (Day Five) held on 2/16/2009. (Court Reporter Rick Congdon)(Tape No. Fort Smith)
246
02/17/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Robert T. Dawson: Jury Trial (Day Six) held on 2/17/2009. (Court Reporter Rick Congdon)(Tape No. Fort Smith)
247
02/18/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Robert T. Dawson: Jury Trial Day Seven held on 2/18/2009. (Court Reporter Rick Congdon)(Tape No. Fort Smith)
248
02/19/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Robert T. Dawson: Jury Trial (Day Eight) held on 2/19/2009. (Court Reporter Rick Congdon)(Tape No. Fort Smith)
249
02/20/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Robert T. Dawson: Jury Trial (Day Nine) and completed on 2/20/2009. (Court Reporter Rick Congdon)(Tape No. Fort Smith)
250
02/20/2009
JURY VERDICT for Defendants and against Plaintiffs.
251
02/23/2009
JUDGMENT on interrogatories finding for the Defendant's. That the Plaintiff's take nothing on their complaint filed herein and the matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All parties are to bear their respective costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 23, 2009.
252
02/25/2009
MOTION for Permission to Interview Jurors by Charles Csiszer, Rozanna Csiszer.
253
02/26/2009
MOTION for Hearing re 252 MOTION for Permission to Interview Jurors by Charles Csiszer, Rozanna Csiszer.
254
03/02/2009
NOTICE by Continental Casualty Company, Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC re 252 MOTION for Permission to Interview Jurors Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Permission to Interview Jurors
255
03/03/2009
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 252 MOTION for Permission to Interview Jurors: Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2009 at 3:00 PM in Fort Smith -- 1st flr (Rm 1004) before Honorable Robert T. Dawson.
256
03/04/2009
NOTICE by Charles Csiszer, Rozanna Csiszer Reply to Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Permission to Interview Jurors
257
03/09/2009
ORDER denying 252 Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Interview Jurors. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 9, 2009.
258
03/09/2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Robert T. Dawson: Motion Hearing re: Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Interview Jurors held on 3/9/2009. (Court Reporter Rick Congdon)(Tape No. Fort Smith).
259
03/09/2009
MOTION for New Trial by Charles Csiszer, Rozanna Csiszer.
1
Brief in Support
2
Exhibit A - deposition of Padgett
3
Exhibit B - Debate transcript
3 Attachments
260
03/19/2009
RESPONSE in Opposition re 259 MOTION for New Trial filed by Mary R. Wren, MD, Wren & Barrow Obstetrics & Gynecology, PLLC.
261
03/20/2009
RESPONSE to Motion re 259 MOTION for New Trial filed by Continental Casualty Company.
262
03/30/2009
ORDER denying 259 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 30, 2009.
263
04/28/2009
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Charles Csiszer, Rozanna Csiszer re 251 Judgment and 262 Order denying Motion for New Trial. (Copy via ECF to: Walter Cox, James Estes, Max Freeman, Louis Hakim, Jory Lange, Lamar Porter, Laaura Smith, Les Weisbrod, Adam Wells, George Wise; via e-mail to Rick Congdon, Court Reporter) Modified on 4/29/2009 to add copy information and links
264
04/29/2009
APPEAL NOTICE to Counsel and Pro Se Parties re 263 Notice of Appeal (atty), Notice of Appeal (atty) filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer
1
Appeal forms A and B
2
Transcript Order Form
3
Prehearing Conference Program
4
Notice regarding exhibits)(jn
4 Attachments
04/29/2009
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 5001154 re 263 Notice of Appeal (atty) filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer. (Text entry; no document attached.)
265
04/29/2009
NOA SUPPLEMENT FORM re 263 Notice of Appeal (atty) filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer.
266
04/29/2009
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Charles Csiszer, Rozanna Csiszer for proceedings held on 02/09/2009 - 04/29/2009 before Judge Robert T. Dawson, re 263 Notice of Appeal (atty), Notice of Appeal (atty) filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer. Copy furnished to Court Reporter/ECRO.
267
05/04/2009
USCA Scheduling Order as to 263 Notice of Appeal (atty) filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer. Case Appealed to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 09-2010.
1
USCA Letter)(jn
1 Attachment
268
05/12/2009
TRANSMITTAL SHEET re 263 Notice of Appeal filed by Rozanna Csiszer and Charles Csiszer. Exhibits: P1-P3, P3B-P13 and P16 - P18; P29A; P38; P54;78A; 78D; P80-P86; P88-P89; P9; CD of Demonstrative Exhibits; and Exhibits: 14, 15, 19,20-28, 29,69,91,93,93A, 99, 100, and 101.
269
06/08/2009
ORDER of USCA as to 263 Notice of Appeal (atty) filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer extending Court Reporter transcript deadline to 7/20/09.
270
07/17/2009
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pre-Trial Conferences on February 4 & 9, 2009, and Jury Trial for dates of February 10-13 and 16-20, 2009, and Hearing on March 9, 2009, before Judge Robert T. Dawson, re 263 Notice of Appeal (atty). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rick L. Congdon, Telephone number 479-709-5470. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before or after the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it, or a redacted transcript, may be obtained through PACER. A Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of the Transcript MUST be filed within 7 calendar days of the filing of the transcript and served manually on the court reporter/transcriber. Redaction Request due 8/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2009.
1
Volume II
2
Volume III
3
Volume IV
4
Volume V
5
Volume VI
6
Volume VII
7
Volume VIII
8
Volume IX
9
Volume X) (jrs) Modified on to edit docket text <a href="javascript:void(0);" class="future-datetime" date="07/17/2020" time="">7/17/20</a>09 (jrs
9 Attachments
271
07/17/2009
NOTICE by Charles Csiszer, Rozanna Csiszer Of Intent to Request Redaction
272
08/06/2009
Printed copy of trial transcript with original exhibits sent to U.S. Court of Appeals: re 263 Notice of Appeal (atty).
1
Exhibits to Transcript)(jn
1 Attachment
273
08/07/2009
MOTION to Modify re Redaction of Transcript by Charles Csiszer, Rozanna Csiszer.
274
08/27/2010
MANDATE of USCA affirming district court decision as to 263 Notice of Appeal (atty), filed by Rozanna Csiszer, Charles Csiszer
1
USCA Opinion
2
USCA Judgment
3
USCA Letter)(jn
3 Attachments
09/17/2010
1 expanding file of exhibits (for transcript) returned from U.S. Court of Appeals. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/04/2010
TRIAL EXHIBITS returned to attorney Freeman per Mandate on appeal. (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.