Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-70349 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 410 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/24/2017
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
2
02/24/2017
Application to Employ A Richard Maples Jr as Attorney for Debtor-in-Possession Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
1
Schedule Declaration Of Proposed Attorney
1 Attachment
3
02/24/2017
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
4
02/24/2017
Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
1
Supplement Creditor Matrix
1 Attachment
5
02/27/2017
Judge Jennifer H. Henderson added to case
02/27/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(17-70349-11) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20401687. Fee Amount 1717.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
02/27/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 2 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.). Hearing scheduled 3/30/2017 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
7
02/27/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing (Minutes of Board of Directors Meeting)(RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.). Incomplete Filings due by 3/13/2017.
8
02/27/2017
Order Granting Motion to Expedite the Motion to Use Cash Collateral; and Notice of Interim Hearing; and Final Hearing Scheduled on Motion to Use Cash Collateral for March 30, 2017, at 1:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600. Signed on 2/27/2017 (RE: related document(s) 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 4 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.). Hearing scheduled 3/2/2017 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
9
02/27/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.). Hearing scheduled 3/30/2017 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
10
02/27/2017
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/30/2017 at 11:00 AM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 1502 Tuscaloosa. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 5/30/2017.
11
02/27/2017
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc. (RE: related document(s) 8 Order and Notice of Hearing).
12
02/28/2017
Chapter 11 Operating Order and Notice of 90 Day Status Conference to be held on May 25, 2017, at 1:30 PM, at 2005 University Boulevard, Room 2600, Tuscaloosa, Alabama. Signed on 2/28/2017.
13
03/01/2017
Motion to Continue Hearing On (related documents 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
14
03/01/2017
Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Position (Limited Objection) Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Rachel L. Webber (RE: related document(s) 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc. filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.).
15
03/01/2017
Objection to (related document(s): 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.) Filed by Creditor Fundamental Funding, LLC
1
Exhibit A - Loan and Security Agreement
1 Attachment
16
03/01/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Gary Wilson Lee Filed by Creditor Fundamental Funding, LLC.
17
03/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11). Notice Date 03/01/2017.
18
03/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Notice of Deficient Filing). Notice Date 03/01/2017.
19
03/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/01/2017.
20
03/02/2017
Amended Certificate of Service (to serve additional parties) Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Rachel L. Webber (RE: related document(s) 14 Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Position).
21
03/02/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by S. Dagnal Rowe Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Rowe, S.)
22
03/02/2017
Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Rowe, S.)
23
03/02/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 13 Motion to Continue Hearing filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 14 Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Position filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Rachel L. Webber, 15 Objection filed by Creditor Fundamental Funding, LLC). Hearing scheduled 3/2/2017 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
24
03/02/2017
Document Certified Resolution By Unanimous Consent of Cuba Timber Co., Inc. Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
25
03/02/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 22 Motion for Adequate Protection filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC). Hearing scheduled 3/30/2017 at 01:30 PM at 2005 University Blvd Rm 2600 (JHH) Tuscaloosa.
26
03/02/2017
Order of Recusal of Judge Jennifer H. Henderson. Signed on 3/2/2017.
27
03/02/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 13 Motion to Continue Hearing filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 14 Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Position filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Rachel L. Webber, 15 Objection filed by Creditor Fundamental Funding, LLC). Hearing scheduled 3/3/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
28
03/03/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing the Debtor's Motion to Continue Hearing on Debtor's Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral is moot. By agreement of the parties, the Debtor's Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral is due to be granted on an interim basis and the parties shall submit a proposed order. Further, these matters are continued to March 20, 2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom number 1 of the Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 Fifth Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Signed on 3/3/2017 (RE: related document(s) 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 13 Motion to Continue Hearing filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 14 Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Position filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Rachel L. Webber, 15 Objection filed by Creditor Fundamental Funding, LLC).
29
03/03/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 2 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.). Hearing scheduled 3/20/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
30
03/03/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 22 Motion for Adequate Protection filed by S. Dagnal Rowe, Attorney for Ford Motor Credit Company LLC). Hearing scheduled 4/5/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
31
03/04/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/04/2017.
32
03/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/05/2017.
33
03/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 29 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/05/2017.
34
03/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/05/2017.
35
03/06/2017
Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/30/2017 at 10:00 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 5/30/2017.
36
03/06/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by James P Wilson Filed by Creditor Avery Timber, Inc.
37
03/08/2017
Notice and Interim Order Signed on 3/8/2017 (RE: related document(s) 3 Granting Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.). Final Hearing scheduled 3/20/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
38
03/08/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Matthew M Cahill Filed by Creditor VFS US LLC.
39
03/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 35 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11). Notice Date 03/08/2017.
40
03/10/2017
Document Notice Of Proof Of Insurance Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
1
Supplement Declaration Pages
1 Attachment
41
03/10/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing: PROBLEM: The filer, Alphonse Richard Maples, Jr, has filed a document not in an upright position when filing the Notice of Proof of Insurance. SOLUTION: The filer, Alphonse Richard Maples, Jr, should refile the document scanning it in the portrait orientation. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerks Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 40 Document filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.).
42
03/10/2017
Document Notice Of Proof Of Insurance Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
1
Supplement Declaration Pages
1 Attachment
43
03/10/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John Dickson Mayo Filed by Creditor FJH, Inc.
44
03/10/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Notice and Order). Notice Date 03/10/2017.
45
03/13/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Matthew M Cahill Filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation.
46
03/13/2017
Bankruptcy Administrator's Motion for an Order Setting Bar Date for Filing Claims Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator John A Dudeck.
47
03/14/2017
Order Granting Signed on 3/14/2017 (RE: related document(s) 46 Bankruptcy Administrator's Motion for an Order Setting Bar Date for Filing Claims filed by Bankruptcy Administrator John A Dudeck).
48
03/14/2017
Notice is hereby given that there may be assets from which a dividend could be paid in this case. Any creditor wishing to participate if there are proceeds from assets available for distribution must, pursuant to Rule 3002 (c)(5) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, file a proof of claim on or before June 12, 2017. For governmental units, a proof of claim must be filed on or before July 12, 2017.
49
03/14/2017
Appointment of Unsecured Creditors Committee Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator John A Dudeck Modified on 3/15/2017 to edit docket text to match PDF.
50
03/14/2017
Amended Appointment of Unsecured Creditors Committee Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator John A Dudeck Modified on 3/15/2017 to edit docket text to match PDF.
51
03/15/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Of Service by Herbert M Newell III Filed by Creditor J.F. Rainer & Son, Inc.
52
03/15/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Of Service by Herbert M Newell III Filed by Creditor Charles Kelm.
53
03/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 47 Order Granting). Notice Date 03/16/2017.
54
03/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 48 Notice to Creditors to File Claims). Notice Date 03/16/2017.
55
03/17/2017
Agreed Order Regarding Adequate Assurance of Future Payment to be made to Alabama Power. Signed on 3/17/2017.
03/17/2017
Corrective Entry: Regenerated to serve Eric Ray. (RE: related document(s) 55 Order (Generic)). (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
03/19/2017
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Creditor Strategic Funding Source, Inc.
57
03/19/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mark D. Taylor Filed by Creditor Strategic Funding Source, Inc.
58
03/19/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 55 Order (Generic)). Notice Date 03/19/2017.
59
03/20/2017
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 56) Signed on 3/20/2017.
60
03/20/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing; the Application is due to be approved. Mr. Maples shall submit a proposed order for entry. Signed on 3/20/2017 (RE: related document(s) 2 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 14 Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Position filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Rachel L. Webber, 15 Objection filed by Creditor Fundamental Funding, LLC). Hearing scheduled 4/20/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
61
03/21/2017
Emergency Motion To Compel Turnover Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
1
Exhibit A #
2
Exhibit B #
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
62
03/21/2017
Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents 61 Motion for Turnover of Property) Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
63
03/21/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 3/21/2017 (RE: related document(s) 61 Motion for Turnover of Property filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 62 Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.). Hearing scheduled 3/24/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
64
03/22/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by R. Scott Williams Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Cuba Timber Co., Inc. (Williams, R.)
65
03/22/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert H Adams Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
66
03/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 59 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 03/22/2017.
67
03/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 60 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/22/2017.
68
03/23/2017
Motion to Continue Hearing On (related documents 61 Motion for Turnover of Property, 62 Motion to Expedite Hearing) Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
69
03/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 63 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/23/2017.
70
03/24/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 3/24/2017 (RE: related document(s) 61 Motion for Turnover of Property filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 68 Granting Motion to Continue Hearing filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.). Hearing scheduled 4/20/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
71
03/24/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Alexandra K. Garrett Filed by Creditor Sweet Water State Bank.
72
03/24/2017
Notice of Change of Address for B & G Equipment and The Industrial Development Board of Aliceville Filed by Alphonse Richard Maples, Jr.
73
03/24/2017
Receipt number from District Court filing fee paid by Mark Taylor (Re Item:56 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601078911 (RE: related document(s) 56 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditor Strategic Funding Source, Inc.).
74
03/26/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 70 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/26/2017.
75
03/27/2017
Second Interim Order To Use Cash Collateral (Related Doc # 3) Signed on 3/27/2017.
76
03/28/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
77
03/28/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
78
03/28/2017
Amended Schedule A/B: Property for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
1
Supplement List of Accounts Receivable
1 Attachment
79
03/28/2017
StatementCumulative Amendment Of Schedules Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc. (RE: related document(s) 78 Schedule A/B: Property).
80
03/29/2017
Application to Employ Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C. as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Cuba Timber Co., Inc. Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Cuba Timber Co., Inc. (Williams, R.)
81
03/29/2017
Order Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 2) Signed on 3/29/2017.
82
03/29/2017
Request for Notice Filed by Creditor MC Williams.
83
03/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 75 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral). Notice Date 03/29/2017.
84
03/30/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Weyerhaeuser NR Co, creditor.
85
03/31/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
86
03/31/2017
Document Notice Of Proof Of Insurance Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
1
Supplement Policy Declarations
1 Attachment
87
03/31/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 81 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 03/31/2017.
88
04/03/2017
Transcript of hearing held on: 03/02/17 You are noticed that a transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy, remote electronic access to this transcript is restricted through 07/3/2017. To review the transcript for redaction purposes, you may purchase a copy from the transcriber, or the transcript may be viewed at the public terminal located in the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, telephone number 609-586-2311. All parties have seven (7) calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Transcript Redaction of any social security numbers, financial account data, names of minor-age children, dates of birth, and home addresses. If the Notice of Intent is filed, the party has 21 calendar days from the date the transcript was filed to file the Transcript Redaction Request indicating the location of the identifiers within the transcript with the Court and to provide the list to the transcriber. The redacted transcript is due 31 days from the date of filing of the transcript. The transcript will be made electronically available to the general public 90 calendar days from the date of filing. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/10/2017. Redaction Request Due By 04/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 05/4/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 07/3/2017.
89
04/03/2017
Transcript of hearing held on: 03/03/17 You are noticed that a transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy, remote electronic access to this transcript is restricted through 07/3/2017. To review the transcript for redaction purposes, you may purchase a copy from the transcriber, or the transcript may be viewed at the public terminal located in the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, telephone number 609-586-2311. All parties have seven (7) calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Transcript Redaction of any social security numbers, financial account data, names of minor-age children, dates of birth, and home addresses. If the Notice of Intent is filed, the party has 21 calendar days from the date the transcript was filed to file the Transcript Redaction Request indicating the location of the identifiers within the transcript with the Court and to provide the list to the transcriber. The redacted transcript is due 31 days from the date of filing of the transcript. The transcript will be made electronically available to the general public 90 calendar days from the date of filing. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/10/2017. Redaction Request Due By 04/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 05/4/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 07/3/2017.
90
04/03/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 80 Application to Employ Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C. as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors). Hearing scheduled 5/3/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
91
04/05/2017
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (RE: Doc #22; Motion for Adequate Protection Payments filed by S. Dagnal Rowe, Attorney for Ford Motor Credit Company LLC) Hearing scheduled 04/05/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
92
04/05/2017
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement, this matter is settled and Mr. Rowe to submit a proposed order for entry.) RE: Doc #22; Motion for Adequate Protection Payments filed by S. Dagnal Rowe, Attorney for Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
93
04/05/2017
Agreed Order on Motion For Adequate Protection Payments filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Related Doc # 22) Signed on 4/5/2017.
94
04/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 90 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/05/2017.
95
04/06/2017
Emergency Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7. Fee Amount $15 Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Cuba Timber Co., Inc. (Williams, R.)
04/06/2017
Receipt of Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7(17-70349-DSC11) [motion,mcnv7] (15.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20554225. Fee Amount 15.00 (re:Doc# 95) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
04/06/2017
Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents 95 Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7) Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Cuba Timber Co., Inc. (Williams, R.)
97
04/06/2017
Motion For Additional Time To Pay Post-Petition Rent And To Assume Or Reject Non-Residential Real Property Lease Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc. to match text to pdf.
1
Exhibit A #
2
Exhibit B) Modified on 4/7/2017 (klt
2 Attachments
98
04/07/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 97 Motion For Additional Time To Pay Post-Petition Rent And To Assume Or Reject Non-Residential Real Property Lease). Hearing scheduled 5/3/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
99
04/07/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 96 Motion to Expedite Hearing on Emergency Motion to Convert filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Cuba Timber Co., Inc.). Hearing scheduled 4/10/2017 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
100
04/07/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 93 Order on Motion for Adequate Protection). Notice Date 04/07/2017.
101
04/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 98 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/09/2017.
102
04/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 99 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/09/2017.
103
04/10/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Paul K Lavelle Filed by Creditor c/o Spina & Lavelle PC Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc.
104
04/10/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc.
1
Exhibit "A"
1 Attachment
105
04/10/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 104 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Adequate Protection).
106
04/10/2017
Response to (Re Item: 96 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents 95 Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Cuba Timber Co., Inc.) Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
1
Supplement Financial Reports
1 Attachment
107
04/10/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 104 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., Motion for Adequate Protection). Hearing scheduled 5/3/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
109
04/10/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 106 Response filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.). Hearing scheduled 4/10/2017 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
110
04/10/2017
**Notice stopped; duplicate of 98** - Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 97 Motion For Additional Time To Pay Post-Petition Rent And To Assume Or Reject Non-Residential Real Property Lease). Hearing scheduled 5/3/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (klt) Modified on 4/10/2017
111
04/10/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 4/10/2017 granting 96 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Cuba Timber Co., Inc., and scheduling 95 Emergency Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Cuba Timber Co., Inc. Hearing scheduled 4/20/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
04/10/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC11) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20569301. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 104) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
112
04/11/2017
Amended Notice Of Proof Of Insurance Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
1
Supplement Policy Declarations) Modified on 4/11/2017 to match text to pdf (klt
1 Attachment
113
04/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 111 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/12/2017.
114
04/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 107 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 04/12/2017.
115
04/13/2017
Motion Seeking to Have the Court Either Release Real Property or Confirm Lease/Lease Extension Filed by Interested Party The Industrial Board of the City of Aliceville
116
04/13/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Herbert M Newell III Filed by Creditor Sipsey Forest Services.
117
04/13/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Herbert M Newell III Filed by Creditor Noland Lumber Co., Inc.
118
04/13/2017
Amended Schedules. Fee Amount $31 Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
119
04/13/2017
Cumulative Amendment of Schedules Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc. (RE: related document(s) 118 Amended Schedules (Fee)). Modified on 4/14/2017 to match text to pdf
04/14/2017
Receipt of Amended Schedules (Fee)(17-70349-DSC11) [misc,amdsch2] (31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20586646. Fee Amount 31.00 (re:Doc# 118) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
120
04/14/2017
Notice of Amendment to Schedules
121
04/14/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 115 115 Motion Seeking to Have the Court Either Release Real Property or Confirm Lease/Lease Extension Filed by Interested Party The Industrial Board of the City of Aliceville). Hearing scheduled 5/17/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
122
04/14/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay or in the Alternative Adequate Protection by Bank of Forest, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Bank of Forest Modified on 4/14/2017 to match text to pdf
04/14/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC11) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20588675. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 122) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
123
04/14/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Bank of Forest (RE: related document(s) 122 Motion for Relief from Stay or in the Alternative Adequate Protection filed by Creditor Bank of Forest). Hearing scheduled 5/3/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
125
04/14/2017
Bk Administrator Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7. Fee Amount $15, or in the alternative Bankruptcy Administrator's Motion to Dismiss with a 180 Day Injunction on Refiling Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator John A Dudeck.
126
04/14/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 125 Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 or in the alternative Motion to Dismiss with a 180 Day Injunction on Refiling filed by Bankruptcy Administrator John A Dudeck). Hearing scheduled 5/17/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
127
04/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 123 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 04/16/2017.
128
04/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 120 Notice of Amendment to Schedules (Chapter 11)). Notice Date 04/16/2017.
129
04/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 121 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/16/2017.
130
04/16/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 126 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/16/2017.
131
04/18/2017
*DOCKETED IN ERROR* Chapter 11 Quarterly Fee Statement for Period: January-March 2017; Fee Amount $19,146.90 Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc. Modified on 4/21/2017
132
04/19/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Richard Maples, has attached a pdf which does not match the docket entry. SOLUTION: The filer, Richard Maples, should docket a corrective entry and refile the pleading with the correct pdf attached. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 131 Chapter 11 Quarterly Fee Statement filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.).
133
04/20/2017
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period February 2017 Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
134
04/20/2017
StatementSignature Card Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
135
04/20/2017
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Docketed In Error Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc. (RE: related document(s) 131 Chapter 11 Quarterly Fee Statement).
04/20/2017
Receipt of Chapter 11 Quarterly Fee Statement(17-70349-DSC11) [misc,qfeerpt] (19.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number Error in Docketing. Fee Amount 19146.90 (re:Doc# 131) (Text entry; no document attached.)
136
04/21/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 4/21/2017 continuing 61 Debtor's Emergency Motion To Compel Turnover. 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor denied. 14 Bankruptcy Administrator's Limited Objection moot. 15 Objection filed by Fundamental Funding, LLC, moot. 95 Emergency Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Cuba Timber Co., Inc., granted and this case is hereby converted to one under Chapter 7 of the U.S. Bankruptcy Code.) Hearing scheduled 5/3/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
137
04/21/2017
Convert Case Proofs of Claims due by 8/21/2017.Government Proof of Claim due by 10/18/2017. 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/22/2017 at 09:00 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.
138
04/21/2017
Notice of Conversion (RE: related document(s) 136 Order and Notice of Hearing).
139
04/21/2017
Order Appointing Trustee. James G Henderson added to the case. Signed on 4/21/2017.
140
04/21/2017
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing (RE: related document(s) 80 Application Application to Employ Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C. as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, 97 Motion For Additional Time To Pay Post-Petition Rent And To Assume Or Reject Non-Residential Real Property Lease with the Industrial Development Board of The City of Aliceville, Alabama, 104 Motion for Relief from Stay, or in the alternative, Motion for Adequate Protection, filed by Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., 122 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Bank of Forest). Hearing scheduled 5/3/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
141
04/21/2017
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing (RE: related document(s) 115 Motion Seeking to Have the Court Either Release Real Property or Confirm Lease/Lease Extension Filed by John Russell, III, Attorney for The Industrial Board of the City of Aliceville, 125 Bankruptcy Administrator's Motion to Convert Case toChapter 7 or in the alternative Motion to Dismiss with a 180 Day Injunctionon Refiling). Hearing scheduled 5/17/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
142
04/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 137 Convert Case). Notice Date 04/23/2017.
143
04/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 136 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/23/2017.
144
04/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 138 Notice). Notice Date 04/23/2017.
145
04/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 140 Notice of Hearing Continued/Rescheduled). Notice Date 04/23/2017.
146
04/23/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 141 Notice of Hearing Continued/Rescheduled). Notice Date 04/23/2017.
147
04/24/2017
Trustee's Rejection of Appointment. James G Hendersonremoved from the case. Filed by Trustee James G Henderson.
148
04/24/2017
Order Appointing Trustee. Andre' M Toffel added to the case. Signed on 4/24/2017.
149
04/24/2017
Amended Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/22/2017 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Proofs of Claims due by 8/21/2017.Government Proof of Claim due by 10/18/2017.
150
04/24/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 4/24/2017 (RE: related document(s) 122 Motion for Relief from Stay or in the Alternative Adequate Protection filed by Bank of Forest). Hearing scheduled 6/7/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
151
04/25/2017
Application to Employ Asset Liquidators Inc as Agent Auctioneer for Trustee Filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc.
152
04/25/2017
Application to Employ Edmond Denaburg as Accountant for Trustee Filed by Accountant Edmond Denaburg
153
04/26/2017
Notice and Order Approving Signed on 4/26/2017 (RE: related document(s) 152 Application to Employ filed by Accountant Edmond Denaburg).
154
04/26/2017
Notice and Order Approving Signed on 4/26/2017 (RE: related document(s) 151 Application to Employ filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc.).
155
04/26/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 149 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Asset). Notice Date 04/26/2017.
156
04/26/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 150 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 04/26/2017.
157
04/27/2017
Amendment to Motion Seeking to Have the Court Either Release Real Property or Confirm Lease/Lease Extension Filed by The Industrial Board of the City of Aliceville
158
04/27/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 157 Amendment to Motion Seeking to Have the Court Either Release Real Property or Confirm Lease/Lease Extension Filed by The Industrial Board of the City of Aliceville). Hearing scheduled 5/17/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
159
04/28/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 153 Notice and Order). Notice Date 04/28/2017.
160
04/28/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 154 Notice and Order). Notice Date 04/28/2017.
161
05/02/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay 2016 FORD F150 vin# 1FTEW1EGXGFB21089, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
162
05/02/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY (RE: related document(s) 161 Motion for Relief from Stay 2016 FORD F150 vin# 1FTEW1EGXGFB21089, Fee Amount $181,).
163
05/02/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay on a 2016 FORD F350 vin# 1FT8W3BT4GEC38974, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
164
05/02/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY (RE: related document(s) 163 Motion for Relief from Stay on a 2016 FORD F350 vin# 1FT8W3BT4GEC38974, Fee Amount $181,).
165
05/02/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay on a 2016 FORD F350 vin# 1FT8W3BTGED36152, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
166
05/02/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY (RE: related document(s) 165 Motion for Relief from Stay on a 2016 FORD F350 vin# 1FT8W3BTGED36152, Fee Amount $181,).
167
05/02/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay on a 2014 FORD F150 vin# 1FTFW1EF9EFB67148, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
168
05/02/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY (RE: related document(s) 167 Motion for Relief from Stay on a 2014 FORD F150 vin# 1FTFW1EF9EFB67148, Fee Amount $181,).
169
05/02/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay on a 2014 FORD F150 vin# 1FTFW1E7EFD04376, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
170
05/02/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY (RE: related document(s) 169 Motion for Relief from Stay on a 2014 FORD F150 vin# 1FTFW1E7EFD04376, Fee Amount $181,).
171
05/02/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay on a 2014 FORD F150 vin# 1FTFW1EFXEKF15773, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
172
05/02/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY (RE: related document(s) 171 Motion for Relief from Stay on a 2014 FORD F150 vin# 1FTFW1EFXEKF15773, Fee Amount $181,).
173
05/02/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay on a 2015 FORD F150 vin# 1FTEW1EP6FFC70159, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
174
05/02/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY (RE: related document(s) 173 Motion for Relief from Stay on a 2015 FORD F150 vin# 1FTEW1EP6FFC70159, Fee Amount $181,).
05/02/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20654945. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 161) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20654945. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 163) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20654945. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 165) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20654945. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 167) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20654945. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 169) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20654945. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 171) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20654945. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 173) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
175
05/03/2017
*DOCKETED IN ERROR - Wrong pfd attached* Application to Employ Rumberger Kirk & Caldwell PC as Attorneys for Trustee Filed by Attorney for Trustee Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C. Modified on 5/3/2017
176
05/03/2017
CORRECTIVE ENTRY wrong pfd attached Filed by Attorney for Trustee Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C. (RE: related document(s) 175 Application to Employ Rumberger Kirk & Caldwell PC as Attorneys for Trustee).
177
05/03/2017
Application to Employ Rumberger Kirk & Caldwell PC as Attorneys for Trustee Filed by Attorney for Trustee Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C.
178
05/03/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Leonard Math, Attorney for Ford Motor Credit Company (RE: related document(s) 161 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 163 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 165 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 167 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 169 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 171 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 173 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY). Hearing scheduled 5/17/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
179
05/03/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
1
Exhibit A-Loan 1 #
2
Exhibit B-Loan 2 #
3
Exhibit C-Loan 3 #
4
Exhibit D-Loan 4 #
5
Exhibit E-Loan 5 #
6
Exhibit F-Loan 6 #
7
Exhibit G-Loan 7 #
8
Exhibit H-Modification Agreement 1 #
9
Exhibit I-Modification Agreement 2 #
10
Exhibit J-Cross Collateral/Cross Default Agreement
10 Attachments
05/03/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20658930. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 179) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
180
05/03/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor VFS US LLC
1
Exhibit A-Schedule 002 #
2
Exhibit B-Schedule 003 #
3
Exhibit C-Schedule 004 #
4
Exhibit D-Schedule 006 #
5
Exhibit E-Schedule 007
5 Attachments
05/03/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20659416. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 180) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
181
05/03/2017
Notice and Order Granting Signed on 5/3/2017 (RE: related document(s) 177 Application to Employ filed by Attorney for Trustee Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C.).
182
05/03/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Matthew Cahill, Attorney for Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation (RE: related document(s) 179 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Motion for Adequate Protection). Hearing scheduled 5/17/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
183
05/03/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Matthew Cahill, Attorney for Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, has filed a Motion for Relief from Stay and when filing the Motion, the filer failed to properly file the Fact Summary Sheet as required by Local Rule 4001-1(c), which may be found on the Court's website at www.alnb.uscourts.gov. SOLUTION: The filer, Matthew Cahill, Attorney for Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, should file the Fact Summary Sheet as a separate event within CM/ECF. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within 14 days prior to the first hearing date on the Motion, the Court may continue, dismiss, or deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 179 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Motion for Adequate Protection).
184
05/03/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Attorney for Mack Financial Services, a division of VFS US LLC (RE: related document(s) 180 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor VFS US LLC, Motion for Adequate Protection). Hearing scheduled 5/17/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
185
05/03/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Matthew M. Cahill, Attorney for Mack Financial Services, a division of VFS US LLC, has filed a Motion for Relief from Stay and when filing the Motion, the filer failed to properly file the Fact Summary Sheet as required by Local Rule 4001-1(c), which may be found on the Court's website at www.alnb.uscourts.gov. SOLUTION: The filer, Matthew M. Cahill, Attorney for Mack Financial Services, a division of VFS US LLC, should file the Fact Summary Sheet as a separate event within CM/ECF. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within 14 days prior to the first hearing date on the Motion, the Court may continue, dismiss, or deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 180 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor VFS US LLC, Motion for Adequate Protection).
187
05/03/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation (RE: related document(s) 179 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Adequate Protection).
188
05/03/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor VFS US LLC (RE: related document(s) 180 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Adequate Protection).
189
05/04/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Matthew Francis Kye Filed by Creditor Hitachi Capital America Corp.
190
05/05/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 5/5/2017 (RE: related document(s) 61 Motion for Turnover of Property filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 97 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 104 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., Motion for Adequate Protection). Hearing scheduled 5/17/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Application to Employ is Approved. (RE: related document(s) 80 Application to Employ filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
191
05/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 181 Notice and Order). Notice Date 05/05/2017.
192
05/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 178 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 05/05/2017.
193
05/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 182 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 05/05/2017.
194
05/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 184 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 05/05/2017.
195
05/07/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 190 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/07/2017.
196
05/10/2017
Letter Filed by James Thorne.
197
05/11/2017
Trustee's Report of Initial Deposit Filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel.
198
05/16/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 5/16/2017 (RE: related document(s) 161 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 163 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 165 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 167 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 169 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 171 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 173 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY). Hearing scheduled 6/7/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
199
05/16/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor MAX LEASINGUSA
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
200
05/16/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor MAX LEASINGUSA (RE: related document(s) 199 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
201
05/16/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor MAX LEASINGUSA
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
202
05/16/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor MAX LEASINGUSA (RE: related document(s) 201 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
05/16/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20710481. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 199) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20710481. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 201) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
203
05/17/2017
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.
204
05/17/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motions for Relief from Stay filed by Leonard Math, Attorney for Max Leasing USA (RE: related document(s) 199 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor MAX LEASINGUSA, 201 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor MAX LEASINGUSA). Hearing scheduled 6/7/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
206
05/18/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 5/18/2017 (RE: related document(s) 97 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 115 Motion filed by Interested Party The Industrial Board of the City of Aliceville, 157 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract filed by Interested Party The Industrial Board of the City of Aliceville, 179 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Motion for Adequate Protection). Hearing scheduled 6/7/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (RE: related document(s) 61 Motion for Turnover of Property filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.) Hearing scheduled 7/19/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Order Mooting Relating to 125 Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck, Bankruptcy Administrator's Motion to Dismiss. (RE: related document(s) 180 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor VFS US LLC, Motion for Adequate Protection, Matter settled, Mr. Cahill shall submit proposed order 104 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., Motion for Adequate Protection) Matter settled, Mr. Spina shall submit proposed order.
207
05/18/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 61 Motion for Turnover of Property filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.). Hearing scheduled 7/19/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
208
05/18/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 198 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 05/18/2017.
209
05/19/2017
Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel (Williams, R.)
210
05/19/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 204 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 05/19/2017.
211
05/20/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 206 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/20/2017.
212
05/22/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 209 Motion to Assume Contract filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel). Hearing scheduled 6/21/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
213
05/24/2017
Final Application for Compensation for Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C., Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 3/17/2017 to 5/18/2017, Fee: $33925.00, Expenses: $513.20. Filed by Attorney Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C. (Williams, R.)
214
05/24/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 212 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/24/2017.
215
05/25/2017
*ENTERED IN ERROR - Incorrect hearing time* Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 213 Application for Compensation filed by Attorney for Trustee Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C.). Hearing scheduled 7/19/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (dls) Modified on 5/25/2017
05/25/2017
Corrective Entry: Incorrect hearing time. (RE: related document(s) 215 Notice of Hearing). (Text entry; no document attached.)
216
05/25/2017
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 104), Granting Motion For Adequate Protection (Related Doc # 104) Signed on 5/25/2017.
217
05/26/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 213 Application for Compensation filed by Attorney for Trustee Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C.). Hearing scheduled 7/19/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
218
05/26/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay to AllowCivil Litigation to Proceed, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Lavenia Carlisle
1
List of 20 Largest Creditors
1 Attachment
05/26/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20750815. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 218) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
219
05/27/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 216 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 05/27/2017.
220
05/28/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 217 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/28/2017.
221
05/30/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Lawrence T. King, Attorney for (RE: related document(s) 218 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Lavenia Carlisle). Hearing scheduled 6/21/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
223
06/01/2017
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay of Mack Financial Services, a division of VFS US LLC (Related Doc # 180) Signed on 6/1/2017.
224
06/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 221 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 06/01/2017.
225
06/03/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 223 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 06/03/2017.
226
06/09/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 6/9/2017 (RE: related document(s) 97 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 115 Motion filed by Interested Party The Industrial Board of the City of Aliceville, 122 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Bank of Forest, 157 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract filed by Interested Party The Industrial Board of the City of Aliceville, 179 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Motion for Adequate Protection). Hearing scheduled 6/21/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
227
06/09/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 6/9/2017 (RE: related document(s) 161 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 167 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 169 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 171 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 173 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY). Hearing scheduled 6/21/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (dls) Modified on 6/9/2017 to correct hearing date from 7/21/2017 to 6/21/2017
06/09/2017
Corrective Entry: Incorrect Hearing date was entered as 7/21/2017, the correct hearing date is 6/21/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (RE: related document(s) 227 Order and Notice of Hearing). (Text entry; no document attached.)
228
06/09/2017
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay by Consent (Related Doc # 163), Granting Motion For Relief From Stay by Consent (Related Doc # 165), Granting Motion For Relief From Stay by Consent (Related Doc # 199), Granting Motion For Relief From Stay by Consent (Related Doc # 201) Signed on 6/9/2017.
229
06/09/2017
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 122) Signed on 6/9/2017.
230
06/11/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 226 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/11/2017.
231
06/11/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 227 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/11/2017.
232
06/11/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 228 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 06/11/2017.
233
06/11/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 229 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 06/11/2017.
234
06/13/2017
Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Stephen B Grow, Attorney for Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC.
235
06/13/2017
Receipt number from District Court filing fee in the amount of 50.00 paid by Stephen B Grow, Attorney for Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Re Item:234 Motion to Appear pro hac vice) B4601080851 (RE: related document(s) 234 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Interested Party Stephen B Grow).
236
06/16/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Charles Michael Smith Filed by Creditor MERCHANTS BANK.
237
06/17/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor MERCHANTS BANK
06/17/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20825203. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 237) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
238
06/17/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor MERCHANTS BANK (RE: related document(s) 237 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
239
06/17/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor MERCHANTS BANK (RE: related document(s) 237 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
240
06/19/2017
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Related Doc # 234) Signed on 6/19/2017.
241
06/19/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by C. Michael Smith, Attorney for Merchants Bank (RE: related document(s) 237 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor MERCHANTS BANK). Hearing scheduled 7/19/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
244
06/19/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC
1
Exhibits A and B
1 Attachment
06/19/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-70349-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20830840. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 244) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
245
06/19/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC (RE: related document(s) 244 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
246
06/20/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Stephen B. Grow, Attorney for Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC (RE: related document(s) 244 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC). Hearing scheduled 7/19/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
248
06/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 240 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 06/21/2017.
249
06/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 241 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 06/21/2017.
250
06/22/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 6/22/2017. Motion for Relief from Stay to Allow Civil Litigation to Proceed is granted for the limited purpose of allowing the movant to pursue its state-court remedies as to insurance proceeds only. (RE: related document(s) 97 Motion to Extend Time filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 115 Motion filed by Interested Party The Industrial Board of the City of Aliceville, 157 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract filed by Interested Party The Industrial Board of the City of Aliceville, 161 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 167 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 169 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 171 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 173 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 179 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Motion for Adequate Protection, 209 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel, 218 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Lavenia Carlisle). Hearing scheduled 7/19/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
251
06/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 246 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 06/22/2017.
252
06/23/2017
Order Mooting Motion to Extend Time (Related Doc # 97), Mooting Motion (Related Doc #115), Mooting Motion To Assume Lease or Executory Contract (Related Doc # 157), Granting Motion To Assume Lease or Executory Contract (Related Doc # 209) Signed on 6/23/2017.
253
06/24/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 250 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/24/2017.
254
06/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 252 Order on Motion to Extend Time). Notice Date 06/25/2017.
255
06/30/2017
Amended Schedules. Fee Amount $31, Amended Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Amended Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc. Modified on 6/30/2017
256
06/30/2017
Statement Filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc. (RE: related document(s) 255 Amended Schedules (Fee)).
06/30/2017
Receipt of Amended Schedules (Fee)(17-70349-DSC7) [misc,amdsch2] (31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20874328. Fee Amount 31.00 (re:Doc# 255) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
257
06/30/2017
Notice of Amendment to Schedules (RE: related document(s) 255 Amended Schedules (Fee) filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc.).
258
07/02/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 257 Notice of Amendment to Schedules (Chapter 7 Asset Cases)). Notice Date 07/02/2017.
259
07/12/2017
Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck (RE: related document(s) 213 Final Application for Compensation for Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C., Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 3/17/2017 to 5/18/2017, Fee: $33925.00, Expenses: $513.20. Filed by Attorney Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C. (Williams, R.) filed by Attorney for Trustee Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C.).
260
07/13/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 259 Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck). Hearing scheduled 7/19/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
261
07/17/2017
Amended Application to Employ Asset Liquidators Inc as Agent/Auctioneer for Trustee Filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc.
262
07/18/2017
Notice and Order Approving Signed on 7/18/2017 (RE: related document(s) 261 Amended Application to Employ filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc.).
263
07/18/2017
Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel (Williams, R.)
264
07/18/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/18/2017 (RE: related document(s) 161 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 167 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 169 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 171 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 173 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY). Hearing scheduled 8/16/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
265
07/19/2017
Application for Compensation for Asset Liquidators, Inc., Auctioneer, Period: 4/25/2017 to 7/14/2017, Fee: $7200.00, Expenses: $262.01. Filed by Attorney jc Toffeloffice
266
07/19/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 263 Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel). Hearing scheduled 8/16/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
267
07/19/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 7/19/2017 (RE: related document(s) 61 Motion for Turnover of Property filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 179 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Motion for Adequate Protection, 213 Application for Compensation filed by Attorney for Trustee Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C., 237 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor MERCHANTS BANK, 244 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC, 259 Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck). Hearing scheduled 8/16/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
268
07/20/2017
Order Approving Application For Compensation (Related Doc#213) for Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C., Special Counsel, Fees awarded: $34,313.20, Expenses awarded: $513.20 Signed on 7/20/2017.
07/20/2017
Corrective Entry: Error in docket text on the amount of the Expenses awarded. Correct amount is $33,800.00, Expenses awarded. (RE: related document(s) 268 Order on Application for Compensation filed by Attorney for Trustee Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C.). (Text entry; no document attached.)
269
07/20/2017
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 237) Signed on 7/20/2017.
270
07/20/2017
Agreed Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 244) Signed on 7/20/2017.
271
07/20/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 265 Application for Compensation filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc.). Hearing scheduled 8/30/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
272
07/20/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 262 Notice and Order). Notice Date 07/20/2017.
273
07/20/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 264 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/20/2017.
274
07/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice Notice Date 07/21/2017.
275
07/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 266 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 07/21/2017.
276
07/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 268 Order on Application for Compensation filed by Attorney for Trustee Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C.). Notice Date 07/22/2017.
277
07/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 269 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 07/22/2017.
278
07/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 270 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 07/22/2017.
279
07/22/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 271 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 07/22/2017.
280
07/25/2017
Motion to Approve Compromise Filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel (Williams, R.)
281
07/25/2017
Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel (Williams, R.)
282
07/25/2017
Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel (Williams, R.)
283
07/26/2017
Application for Compensation Pitts Trl #1170 for Asset Liquidators, Inc., Auctioneer, Period: 4/25/2017 to 7/26/2017, Fee: $1250.00, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Attorney jc Toffeloffice
284
07/26/2017
Application for Compensation (Cat Equip.) for Asset Liquidators, Inc., Auctioneer, Period: 4/25/2017 to 7/26/2017, Fee: $41,500.00, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Attorney jc Toffeloffice
285
07/26/2017
Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel (Williams, R.)
286
07/26/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 280 Motion to Approve Compromise filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel, 281 Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel, 282 Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel, 283 Application for Compensation filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc., 284 Application for Compensation filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc., 285 Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel). Hearing scheduled 8/30/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
287
07/27/2017
Application for Compensation for Asset Liquidators, Inc., Auctioneer, Period: 4/25/2017 to 7/27/2017, Fee: $300.00, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Attorney jc Toffeloffice
288
07/28/2017
Notice and Order Approving Signed on 7/28/2017 (RE: related document(s) 287 Application for Compensation filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc.).
289
07/28/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 286 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 07/28/2017.
290
07/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 288 Notice and Order). Notice Date 07/30/2017.
291
08/04/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 8/4/2017. Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Leonard Math, Attorney for Ford Motor Credit Company (2014 Ford F150 vin# 1FTFW1E7EFD04376) is granted without objection. Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Leonard Math, Attorney for Ford Motor Credit Company (2015 Ford F150 vin# 1FTEW1EP6FFC70159) is granted without objection. (RE: related document(s) 161 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 167 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 169 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 171 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 173 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY). Hearing scheduled 8/30/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
292
08/06/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 291 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/06/2017.
293
08/07/2017
Amended Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) Filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel (Williams, R.)
294
08/08/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 293 Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel). Hearing scheduled 8/30/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
295
08/08/2017
Amended Motion for Relief from Stay and Consolidated Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
296
08/10/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Amended Motion for Relief from Stay and Motion to Consolidated filed by Leonard Math, Attorney for Ford Motor Credit Company (RE: related document(s) 295 Amended Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC). Hearing scheduled 8/30/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
298
08/11/2017
Consent Order Lifting Automatic Stay filed by Steven D. Altmann, Attorney for Great Southern Bank. Signed on 8/11/2017.
299
08/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 296 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 08/12/2017.
300
08/13/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 298 Consent Order Lifting Automatic Stay). Notice Date 08/13/2017.
301
08/14/2017
Objection to (related document(s): 263 Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel) Filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
302
08/15/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 301 Objection filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY). Hearing scheduled 8/16/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
303
08/15/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 8/15/2017 (RE: related document(s) 61 Motion for Turnover of Property filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 179 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Motion for Adequate Protection, 263 Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel, 301 Objection filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY). Hearing scheduled 8/30/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
304
08/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 303 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 08/17/2017.
305
08/23/2017
Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck (RE: related document(s) 265 Application for Compensation for Asset Liquidators, Inc., Auctioneer, Period: 4/25/2017 to 7/14/2017, Fee: $7200.00, Expenses: $262.01. Filed by Attorney jc Toffeloffice filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc.).
306
08/23/2017
Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck (RE: related document(s) 284 Application for Compensation (Cat Equip.) for Asset Liquidators, Inc., Auctioneer, Period: 4/25/2017 to 7/26/2017, Fee: $41,500.00, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Attorney jc Toffeloffice filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc.).
307
08/23/2017
Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck (RE: related document(s) 283 Application for Compensation Pitts Trl #1170 for Asset Liquidators, Inc., Auctioneer, Period: 4/25/2017 to 7/26/2017, Fee: $1250.00, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Attorney jc Toffeloffice filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc.).
308
08/24/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 305 Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck, 306 Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck, 307 Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck). Hearing scheduled 8/30/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
309
09/01/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 9/1/2017 (RE: related document(s) 61 Mooting Motion for Turnover of Property filed by Debtor Cuba Timber Co., Inc., 161 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 167 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 171 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 263 Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel, 265 Application for Compensation filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc., 295 Amended Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, 301 Objection filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 305 Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck). Hearing scheduled 9/20/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
310
09/03/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 309 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/03/2017.
311
09/06/2017
Order Approving Application For Compensation (Related Doc#284) for Asset Liquidators, Inc., Auctioneer, Fees awarded: $41,500.00, Expenses awarded: $0.00; Awarded on 9/6/2017 Signed on 9/6/2017.
312
09/06/2017
Order Approving Application For Compensation (Related Doc#283) for Asset Liquidators, Inc., Auctioneer, Fees awarded: $1,250.00, Expenses awarded: $0.00; Awarded on 9/6/2017 Signed on 9/6/2017.
313
09/06/2017
Order Granting Motion and Approving Compromise (Related Doc# 280) Signed on 9/6/2017.
314
09/06/2017
Order Granting Amended Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) (Related Doc # 281), Granting Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) (Related Doc # 293), Granting Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 179) Signed on 9/6/2017.
315
09/06/2017
Order Granting Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) (Related Doc # 285) Signed on 9/6/2017.
316
09/06/2017
Order Granting Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) (Related Doc # 282) Signed on 9/6/2017.
09/06/2017
Corrective Entry - Regenerated to serve parties. (RE: related document(s) 316 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)). (Text entry; no document attached.)
317
09/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 311 Order on Application for Compensation filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc.). Notice Date 09/08/2017.
318
09/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 312 Order on Application for Compensation filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc.). Notice Date 09/08/2017.
319
09/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 313 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise). Notice Date 09/08/2017.
320
09/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 314 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)). Notice Date 09/08/2017.
321
09/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 315 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)). Notice Date 09/08/2017.
322
09/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 316 Order on Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)). Notice Date 09/08/2017.
323
09/22/2017
Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc#265) for Asset Liquidators, Inc., Auctioneer, Fees awarded: $3,700.00, Expenses awarded: $262.01; Awarded on 9/22/2017 Signed on 9/22/2017.
324
09/24/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 323 Order on Application for Compensation filed by Auctioneer Asset Liquidators, Inc.). Notice Date 09/24/2017.
325
09/25/2017
Courtroom Deputy Notes (Public) By agreement of the parties, these matters are settled and Mrs. Luders shall submit a proposed order. (RE: related document(s) 161 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 167 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 171 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, 263 Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) filed by Trustee Andre' M Toffel, 295 Amended Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, 301 Objection filed by Creditor FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY)
326
09/28/2017
Order Granting in part and Denying in Part Trustee's Motion to Sell Property under Section 363(b) and Modifying Automatic Stay as to Ford Motor Credit Company (Related Doc # 295), Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 161), Granting Motion For Sale of Property under Section 363(b) (Related Doc # 263) Signed on 9/28/2017.
327
09/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 326 Order on Amended Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 09/30/2017.
348
06/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
358
07/19/2018
Complaint
359
07/19/2018
Complaint
362
07/30/2018
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
382
09/14/2018
Notice of Hearing - (Van020 Enter Matter)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.