Curtis d Nelson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-bk-03185 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 104 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/27/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Curtis D Nelson
2
07/27/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
3
07/27/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson
5
07/27/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
6
07/27/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
7
07/27/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/30/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 09/19/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 11/28/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 01/23/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 10/30/2017.
8
07/27/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
9
07/28/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
07/28/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Curtis D Nelson Case Number 00-05676, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/14/2000, Dismissed for Other Reason on 10/30/2001.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
07/28/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson).
11
07/28/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtor, has not incuded the Debtor's social security number when filing the Social Security - Form B121. SOLUTION: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtor, should enter a Corrective Entry relating to #4 stating the error and refile the Social Security - Form B121. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 4 Social Security - Form B121 filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson).
13
07/28/2017
CORRECTIVE ENTRY error on PDF Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson (RE: related document(s) 11 Notice of Incorrect Event/Filing). Related document(s) 4 Social Security - Form B121 filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson. Modified on 7/31/2017
14
07/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 07/29/2017.
15
07/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson). Notice Date 07/30/2017.
16
07/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 07/30/2017.
17
08/07/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor Franklin Credit Managemnet Corp.
18
08/19/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
19
08/29/2017
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Franklin Credit Mangement Corporation (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.).
20
08/30/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 19 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Franklin Credit Mangement Corporation). Hearing scheduled 9/19/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
21
08/31/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 8/30/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
22
09/05/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
23
09/06/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 22 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 9/19/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
24
09/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/08/2017.
25
09/10/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 2 of IRS in the amount of $9,598.72 Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
26
09/11/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 25 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson). Hearing scheduled 10/17/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
27
09/13/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/13/2017.
28
09/19/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 9/19/2017 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing), 19 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Franklin Credit Mangement Corporation, 22 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 10/17/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (klt) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2017
09/19/2017
Corrective Entry - regenerated to attach pdf (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Rescheduling Hearing). (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
09/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 09/21/2017.
30
10/05/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Christiana Trust, a division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Indenture Trustee with respect to NRPL Trust 2014-2 c/o Selene Finance LP.
31
10/18/2017
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Navient Solutions, LLC. on behalf of (Claim No. 3) To Navient Solutions, LLC. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor Navient Solutions, LLC.
10/18/2017
Receipt of Transfer of Claim(17-03185-DSC13) [claims,trclm] (25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21292283. Fee Amount 25.00 (re:Doc# 31) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 232.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-03185-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (232.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21295716. Fee Amount 232.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
10/20/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 31 Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor Navient Solutions, LLC). Notice Date 10/20/2017.
33
10/23/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 10/23/2017 (RE: related document(s) 22 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case withdrawn in open court. The following matters are continued: 7 Confirmaton Hearing, 19 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Franklin Credit Mangement Corporation). Hearing scheduled 11/28/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
34
10/23/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
35
10/23/2017
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
36
10/23/2017
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
37
10/23/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 10/23/2017 (RE: related document(s) 25 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson). Hearing scheduled 11/28/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
38
10/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 33 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 10/25/2017.
39
10/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 37 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 10/25/2017.
40
10/26/2017
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 19 Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Franklin Credit Mangement Corporation (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.).).
11/08/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-03185-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21374977. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
11/08/2017
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 10 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
42
11/28/2017
Order on Objection to Claim(s) 2 - Objection to claim #2 is withdrawn in opencourt. Signed on 11/28/2017 (RE: related document(s) 25 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson).
43
11/28/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 11/28/2017 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing). Hearing scheduled 1/30/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
44
11/28/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
45
11/28/2017
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
46
11/28/2017
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
47
11/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 42 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 11/30/2017.
48
11/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 43 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 11/30/2017.
49
01/23/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
50
01/24/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 49 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/30/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
51
01/24/2018
Amended Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 49 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/30/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
01/25/2018
Corrective Entry - notice regenerated to show "amended" (RE: related document(s) 51 Notice of Hearing). (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
01/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 51 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/26/2018.
53
02/02/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/2/2018 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing, 49 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/6/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
54
02/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 53 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/04/2018.
55
03/02/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson (RE: related document(s) 44 Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.).
56
03/02/2018
Amended Schedule A/B: Property Individual, Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
57
03/02/2018
Real Property Appraisal by Private professional appraiser Filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson.
58
03/06/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 3/6/2018 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing, 49 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 4/10/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
59
03/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 58 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 03/08/2018.
60
04/11/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
61
04/25/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 4/25/2018 (RE: related document(s) 49 Trustees objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied, 55 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Curtis D Nelson).
62
04/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 61 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 04/27/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.