Curtis et al v. Providence Health & Services et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00281 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/06/2018
Notice of Removal
2
12/06/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
12/07/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
4
12/07/2018
Errata
5
12/07/2018
Notice (Other)
6
12/07/2018
Notice (Other)
7
12/11/2018
Notice of Service List
8
12/11/2018
Notice (Other)
9
12/13/2018
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
10
12/13/2018
Declaration
11
12/13/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
12
12/13/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
13
12/14/2018
Remand
14
12/28/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
15
01/02/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
16
01/02/2019
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
17
01/03/2019
Notice (Other)
18
01/08/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
19
01/16/2019
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
20
01/16/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
01/17/2019
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
02/12/2019
ORDER denying 13 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/12/19.
23
02/19/2019
Notice (Other)
24
02/27/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
02/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
03/05/2019
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Amended complaint due 3/26/19. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 3/5/19.
27
03/11/2019
Jury Demand
28
03/13/2019
Extension of Time to File Answer
29
03/14/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
30
04/09/2019
Answer to Complaint
31
04/10/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
32
04/26/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
33
04/29/2019
Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.