CyTique Tiesha Johnson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80188 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Approving
05/23/2018
Incorrect Event (Notice of) (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
06/28/2018
Objection to Claim(s)
08/14/2018
Corrective Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
104
12/18/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement
105
12/18/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement
108
12/21/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (Chapter 7 or 11 Indiv.)
109
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
110
12/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.