Cynthia D. Cleveland
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82002 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/06/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
10
07/07/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
07/09/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
08/31/2018
Amended Schedules (Fee)
60
12/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
61
12/28/2018
Modification of Plan (Trustee Motion)
62
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
01/02/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change
02/22/2019
Request for Clerk to Send Notice of Filing of Claim by Debtor or Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.