Cynthia Marie Walton-Davis and Robert Dale Davis
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

5:2019-bk-00098 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/29/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
03/29/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
03/29/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
03/29/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
5
03/29/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
03/29/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
03/29/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
7
03/29/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
03/29/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
9
03/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
03/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
03/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
03/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
04/01/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
04/01/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
04/02/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
15
04/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
16
04/05/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
17
04/05/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
18
04/05/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
19
04/05/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
04/10/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.