Dale Eugene Stowers
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00114 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
22
06/18/2018
Request for Special Notice
23
07/16/2018
Generic Motion / Application
24
07/16/2018
Generic Motion / Application
25
07/17/2018
Generic Motion
07/18/2018
Update Deadline (Discharge / Closing) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/30/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
27
07/30/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing
28
08/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
29
08/29/2018
Proceeding Memo
30
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
31
10/10/2018
Rescission of Reaffirmation Agreement
10/11/2018
Calendar Remark (Settled / Removed) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
10/16/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
33
10/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
10/19/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.