Dale Wayne Johnson and Lawana Stella Johnson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00151 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
doc
05/22/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
doc
05/31/2018
Extend Time
doc
06/01/2018
Extend Time
15
06/20/2018
Schedules A-J
16
06/20/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
17
06/20/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
18
06/20/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
19
06/20/2018
Affidavit of Service
20
06/20/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
06/20/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/20/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
22
06/20/2018
Certificate of Service
23
06/20/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
24
06/20/2018
Certificate of Service
25
06/20/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
06/21/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
06/27/2018
Entry of Appearance
27
07/11/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
28
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
29
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
07/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
07/19/2018
Certificate of No Objection
31
07/19/2018
Certificate of No Objection
32
07/27/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
33
07/31/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
34
07/31/2018
Certificate of Service
35
07/31/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
36
07/31/2018
Certificate of Service
37
08/02/2018
Entry of Appearance
08/03/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
08/10/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
39
08/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
40
08/16/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
41
08/16/2018
Generic Motion / Application
42
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
43
08/21/2018
Generic Motion
44
08/23/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
45
08/24/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
46
08/24/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
47
08/28/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
48
08/28/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
49
08/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
50
08/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
51
09/11/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
52
09/11/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
09/11/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
09/11/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
54
09/11/2018
Certificate of Service
55
10/01/2018
Non-Opposition
10/02/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
10/11/2018
Certificate of No Objection
57
10/18/2018
Relief from Stay
58
10/25/2018
Modify Plan (After Confirmation)
59
10/25/2018
Modified Plan (After Confirmation) (BKPLAN03)
60
10/25/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
61
10/25/2018
Affidavit of Service
62
10/25/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
63
10/25/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
10/25/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
11/19/2018
Certificate of No Objection
65
11/20/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
66
11/20/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
67
11/21/2018
Approving Modification of Plan (BKPLAN05) (SA)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.