Dallas v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Court Docket Sheet

2:2016-cv-01392 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 212 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/06/2016
COMPLAINT filed by Annette M Davis. (submitted by Howard Olinsky)
1
Letter
2
Civil Cover Sheet)(REK
2 Attachments
2
05/06/2016
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Annette M Davis. (submitted by Howard Olinsky)
3
05/06/2016
SUMMONS Submitted by Annette M Davis. (submitted by Howard Olinsky)
1
Summons
2
Summons)(REK
2 Attachments
4
05/06/2016
This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-01392-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.
5
05/09/2016
AMENDED COMPLAINT, correcting Plaintiff's last name to Dallas, against Carolyn W Colvin filed by Annette M Davis.
1
Letter to Clerk
1 Attachment
6
05/11/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Howard D. Olinsky by Annette M Dallas.
1
Letter to Clerk
1 Attachment
7
05/11/2016
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Howard D. Olinsky filed by Annette M Dallas. Pro Hac Vice motion submitted with state court certificate of good standing. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please resubmit motion in paper form with original certificates of good standing from a federal court. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within seven business days of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
8
05/11/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Howard D. Olinsky inc. federal court certificate of good standing to correct deficiency by Annette M Dallas.
1
Letter to Clerk
1 Attachment
05/17/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX171988 as to Howard D Olinsky. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
05/17/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
10
07/22/2016
ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs 2 is granted; Plaintiff is responsible for service of the Summons and Amended Complaint on Defendant. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/22/16.
11
07/25/2016
Summons Issued as to Carolyn W Colvin, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.
1
Summons
2
Summons)(BAS
2 Attachments
12
08/19/2016
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lars J Nelson appearing for Carolyn W Colvin.
13
08/22/2016
*SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Annette M Dallas: Return of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon US Attorney's Office, Office of General Counsel, Attorney General on 8/8/2016, 8/8/2016, and 8/10/2016. *Modified to include information on 8/23/2016
14
09/29/2016
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (See attached Order for deadlines and details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/29/16. (JAMA)
15
10/11/2016
ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by Carolyn W Colvin.
16
10/11/2016
NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript re: 15 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Carolyn W Colvin.
1
001 Certification Page
2
002 Court Transcript Index
3
003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable
4
004 Payment Documents and Decisions
5
005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices
6
006 Non Disability Related Development
7
007 Disability Related Development
8
008 Medical Records Part 1
9
009 Medical Records Part 2
10
010 Medical Records Part 3
11
011 Medical Records Part 4
11 Attachments
17
12/12/2016
OPENING BRIEF by Annette M Dallas Social Security appeal.
18
01/10/2017
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Brief, Unopposed by Carolyn W Colvin.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
19
01/10/2017
DECLARATION of Lars J. Nelson re: 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Brief, Unopposed by Defendant Carolyn W Colvin.
20
01/11/2017
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting 18 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file Defendant's response to Plaintiff's opening brief. Defendant has until February 9, 2017, to file her response brief. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/11/17.(JAMA)
21
02/09/2017
RESPONSE BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
22
09/25/2017
ORDER reversing the September 24, 2014 decision of the Administrative Law Judge, (R. at 21-34), as upheld by the Appeals Council on March 4, 2016, (R. at 1-3). ORDERED remanding this case to the Social Security Administration for a calculation of benefits. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to enter final judgment consistent with this Order and close this case. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/25/17.
23
09/25/2017
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed September 25, 2017, the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is reversed, and this case is remanded to the Social Security Administration for further proceedings consistent with the Order.
24
12/22/2017
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412, Opposed by Annette M Dallas.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
25
12/22/2017
AFFIDAVIT in Support re: [24] First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412, Opposed filed by Annette M Dallas.
1
Exhibit A All Professional Time
2
Exhibit B Attorney Time
3
Exhibit C Paralegal Time
4
Exhibit D Expenses
5
Exhibit E Affirmation and Waiver of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees
6
Memorandum in Support
7
Certificate of Service
8
Certificate of Local Rule 54.2 (D) (1)
8 Attachments
26
12/27/2017
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Thomas M. Elsberry appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Attorney Lars J Nelson terminated.
27
01/05/2018
RESPONSE to Motion re: [24] First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C Sect. 2412, Opposed filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.
28
01/18/2018
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that attorney fees (re: motion at [24]) in the total amount of $6,909.42 pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. ยง 2412(d) are awarded to Plaintiff. Astrue v. Ratliff, 130 S. Ct. 2521 (2010). IT IS FURTHER ORDERD that Plaintiff is awarded $17.25 in expenses for Certified Mail for service of Summons and Complaint. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/18/18.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.