Daniel Alexander Price
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00170 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/31/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
doc
05/31/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
doc
05/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
doc
05/31/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
05/31/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
06/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
doc
06/04/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
06/05/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
13
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
06/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
06/29/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
15
06/29/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
16
07/02/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
17
07/02/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
18
07/03/2018
Certificate of Service
19
07/05/2018
Request for Special Notice
07/10/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
07/25/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
21
07/25/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
22
07/27/2018
Notice Requiring Original Signature
23
07/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/31/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
08/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
25
08/02/2018
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan (SA)
08/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
27
08/22/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
28
08/22/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
29
08/22/2018
Certificate of Service
08/22/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
09/24/2018
Certificate of No Objection
31
09/24/2018
Certificate of Service
32
09/27/2018
Relief from Stay
33
09/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/14/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
10/30/2018
Entry of Appearance
35
10/30/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
36
10/30/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
10/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
11/08/2018
Non-Opposition
38
11/08/2018
Voluntary Conversion From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Fee)
11/08/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
11/09/2018
Converting Case To Chapter 7 (BKCONV01-COAfter) (SA)
11/09/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
11/09/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
41
11/09/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
42
11/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
43
11/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
44
11/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
45
11/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
46
11/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11/14/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
11/16/2018
Certificate of No Objection
48
11/20/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
49
11/28/2018
Relief from Stay
11/28/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
11/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/14/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.