Daniel Blackerby
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01564 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
doc
05/24/2018
Trustee Objection to Confirmation of Plan
doc
05/25/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
40
02/15/2019
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss
41
02/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
02/27/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.