Daniel Edward Williams
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

5:2018-bk-00201 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/26/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
06/26/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
06/26/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
06/26/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
06/27/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
7
06/29/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
06/29/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
06/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
06/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
06/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
06/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
07/11/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
07/13/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
07/13/2018
Change of Address
16
07/13/2018
Certificate of Service
07/13/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.