Daniel James Finch
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00275 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/24/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
08/24/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
08/24/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
08/24/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
08/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
08/24/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
5
08/24/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
08/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
7
08/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
08/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
08/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
08/27/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
11
08/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
12
08/30/2018
Entry of Appearance
13
08/30/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
16
09/21/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
17
09/21/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
18
09/21/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
19
09/21/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
09/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
11/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
21
11/08/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
22
11/08/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
23
11/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
11/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.