Daniel James Turner and Lindsay Breanne Turner
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00365 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/24/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/24/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
10/24/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/24/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
10/24/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
10/24/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
6
10/24/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
10/24/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/24/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10/25/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
10/25/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
12
10/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
10/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
14
10/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
11/13/2018
Entry of Appearance
16
11/19/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
11/19/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
12/01/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/01/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
Statement of Presumed Abuse (ST1) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
Statement of Declination (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
12/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - USTs Statement of Presumed Abuse

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.