Daniel Lawrence Rudder and Sarahy Stephanie Lopez Rudder
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00413 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/05/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
12/05/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
12/05/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
12/05/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
12/06/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
12/07/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
12/07/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
9
12/07/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
10
12/07/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
11
12/07/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
12/07/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
12/07/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
14
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
15
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
16
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
17
12/20/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
18
01/02/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
19
01/02/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
20
01/02/2019
Certificate of Service
21
01/02/2019
Generic Motion / Application
22
01/02/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
23
01/02/2019
Certificate of Service
24
01/07/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
25
01/08/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
01/09/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
01/11/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
27
01/11/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
28
01/23/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
01/25/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
01/29/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
01/30/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
01/31/2019
Proceeding Memo
31
02/01/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
32
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
02/05/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
02/05/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
34
03/06/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
35
03/12/2019
Certificate of No Objection
36
03/13/2019
Generic Motion
03/13/2019
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
03/13/2019
Proceeding Memo
38
03/14/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
39
03/14/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
03/14/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
41
03/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.