Daniel Richard Cuneo and Amanda Lynn Cuneo
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00346 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/11/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/11/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
3
10/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/11/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/12/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
8
10/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
10/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
10/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
10/18/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
12
10/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
10/29/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10/31/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
11/08/2018
Request for Special Notice
11/16/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
11/21/2018
Redemption Agreement
11/26/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/27/2018
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
11/27/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
11/29/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
18
11/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
11/30/2018
Request for Special Notice
20
12/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
12/10/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
22
12/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/14/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
12/14/2018
Vacating Order (SA)
24
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
12/19/2018
Proceeding Memo
26
12/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
27
12/20/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
12/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
12/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
29
12/27/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
30
12/27/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
31
12/27/2018
Certificate of Service
12/27/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
12/31/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
33
12/31/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
34
12/31/2018
Certificate of Service
12/31/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
01/02/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
01/03/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
37
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
01/15/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
01/16/2019
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
39
01/17/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
40
01/17/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
41
01/17/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
42
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
43
01/19/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
01/23/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
01/23/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
45
01/23/2019
Declaration
46
01/24/2019
Certificate of No Objection
47
01/24/2019
Certificate of Service
48
01/31/2019
Relief from Stay
49
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
50
02/05/2019
Hearing
51
02/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
52
02/15/2019
Proceeding Memo
02/20/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
03/13/2019
Order (Generic) (SA)
03/14/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
03/15/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
55
03/19/2019
Errata
56
03/19/2019
Certificate of Service
57
03/20/2019
Relief from Stay
03/22/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
03/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
59
04/05/2019
Affidavit

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.