Daniel Scott D'Armond
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02132 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 228 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
doc
05/23/2018
Appointing Trustee
1
05/22/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Daniel Scott D'Armond
3
05/22/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Daniel Scott D'Armond.
4
05/22/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Daniel Scott D'Armond.
5
05/22/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/25/2018 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 08/24/2018.
6
05/22/2018
Supplement Filed by Debtor Daniel Scott D'Armond (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)).
05/22/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-02132-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22095765. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
05/23/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
8
05/23/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Andre' M Toffel added to the case. Signed on 5/23/2018.
9
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 05/24/2018.
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 05/25/2018.
11
06/07/2018
Motion to Redeem Property of the Estate Filed by Debtor Daniel Scott D'Armond
12
06/07/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 11 Motion to Redeem Property of the Estate filed by Debtor Daniel Scott D'Armond). Hearing scheduled 7/10/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
13
06/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 12 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/09/2018.
14
06/14/2018
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors on 7/2/2018 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. (Toffel, Andre')
15
07/10/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and the parties shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #11; Debtor's Motion to Redeem Property of the Estate
16
07/30/2018
Order Granting Motion To Redeem (Related Doc # 11) Signed on 7/30/2018.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.