Danielle Castonguay
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00241 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
07/30/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
07/30/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
4
07/30/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
07/30/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
07/30/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
07/30/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
07/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10
08/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
08/03/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
15
08/03/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
08/10/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.