Danilo A. Santiago and Elizabeth L. Santiago
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00101 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/01/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
04/01/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
04/01/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
04/01/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
04/01/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
5
04/01/2019
Notice of Deficiency of Verification of Creditor Mailing Matrix
04/01/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
04/02/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
04/02/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
11
04/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
04/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
04/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
14
04/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
15
04/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
16
04/15/2019
Verification of Creditor Mailing Matrix
17
04/15/2019
Extend Time
18
04/15/2019
Declaration
04/19/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.