Danny L Sheets, Jr and Rosario H Sheets
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00082 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
17
06/19/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
06/19/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
06/19/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
19
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
07/09/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
21
07/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/12/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.