Darius Varner
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00315 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/21/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
09/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
09/21/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
09/22/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
09/24/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
09/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
09/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
09/27/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
11
10/03/2018
Request for Special Notice
12
10/09/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
13
10/09/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
14
10/09/2018
Certificate of Service
10/09/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
10/17/2018
Request for Special Notice
10/18/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/23/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
17
10/23/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
18
10/23/2018
Certificate of Service
10/23/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/23/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
10/29/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
11/06/2018
Certificate of No Objection
21
11/06/2018
Certificate of Service
11/07/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
11/20/2018
Certificate of No Objection
23
11/20/2018
Certificate of Service
24
12/06/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
25
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
12/11/2018
Relief from Stay
28
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/14/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.