Darlene Pettus
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82112 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
22
09/03/2018
Notice of Withdrawal
23
09/04/2018
Approving
33
01/15/2019
Limit Notice
39
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
40
02/04/2019
Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay
41
02/06/2019
Notice of Withdrawal
43
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
48
03/20/2019
Limit Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.