Darryl Aaberg and Elizabeth Aaberg
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:1998-bk-00912 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
43
06/25/2018
Employ (CM41)
44
06/25/2018
Employ
45
06/27/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
46
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
47
07/18/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
48
07/23/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
49
11/01/2018
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
50
11/21/2018
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
51
11/21/2018
Certificate of Service
12/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
12/13/2018
Certificate of No Objection
53
12/20/2018
Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)
12/20/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
02/22/2019
Chapter 7 Trustees Final Account and Distribution Report (TDR)
02/22/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.