Darryl Avery
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01806 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
27
07/30/2018
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury
28
07/30/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
doc
08/06/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges
36
10/07/2018
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules
39
11/11/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
40
11/11/2018
Appraisal
41
11/11/2018
Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules
48
02/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.