David Brian Ward and Ashley Vollrath Ward
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00151 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 120 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/12/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by David Brian Ward, Ashley Vollrath Ward
3
01/12/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed by Joint Debtor Ashley Vollrath Ward, Debtor David Brian Ward.
4
01/12/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Ashley Vollrath Ward, Debtor David Brian Ward.
01/12/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-00151-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21602070. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/12/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/12/2018 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 04/13/2018.
6
01/13/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
7
01/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 01/14/2018.
01/15/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors David Brian Ward and Ashley Vollrath Ward Case Number 05-02347, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/09/2005, Standard Discharge on 06/22/2005.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
01/13/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
9
01/16/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Andre' M Toffel added to the case. Signed on 1/16/2018.
10
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
11
01/24/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Enslen Crowe Filed by Creditor PennyMac Loan Services, LLC.
12
02/12/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Andre' M Toffel, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 180851.00, Assets Exempt: $ 41976.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 390953.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 390953.00. Debtor appeared. Joint debtor absent. (Toffel, Andre')
13
03/20/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Joint Debtor Ashley Vollrath Ward, Debtor David Brian Ward.
14
04/10/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
1
Note #
2
Mortgage
2 Attachments
15
04/10/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (RE: related document(s) 14 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
04/10/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(18-00151-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21941497. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 14) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
04/11/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Enslen Crowe, attorney for PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (RE: related document(s) 14 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor PennyMac Loan Services, LLC). Hearing scheduled 5/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
18
04/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 16 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 04/13/2018.
19
05/14/2018
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay Without Objection. (Related Doc # 14) Signed on 5/14/2018.
20
05/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 05/16/2018.
doc
05/21/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (Chapter 7 or 11 Indiv.)
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.