David Daniel Charles and Connie J Charles
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2019-bk-00124 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/18/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
04/18/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
04/18/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
04/18/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
04/19/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
04/19/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
04/19/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/19/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
8
04/19/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
04/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
04/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
04/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
04/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
04/26/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
14
04/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
15
05/03/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
16
05/06/2019
Change of Address
05/06/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
05/13/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
18
05/13/2019
Certificate of Service

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.