David Eugene George
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00008 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/14/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
01/14/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/15/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/15/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
4
01/15/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
01/16/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/15/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
6
01/16/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
7
01/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
01/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
01/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
01/25/2019
Request for Special Notice
11
01/29/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
12
01/29/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
13
01/29/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
14
01/29/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
15
01/29/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
16
01/29/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
01/30/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
02/08/2019
Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)
18
02/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim
19
02/11/2019
Employ (CM41)
20
02/11/2019
Declaration
21
02/15/2019
Employ
22
03/01/2019
Employ (CM41)
23
03/01/2019
Declaration
24
03/01/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
25
03/05/2019
Employ
26
03/25/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
27
03/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
03/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
29
04/07/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
30
04/11/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
31
04/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
32
04/16/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
33
04/16/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
34
04/16/2019
Certificate of Service
35
04/16/2019
Exhibit To
04/16/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
04/30/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
37
05/02/2019
Joinder
38
05/03/2019
Hearing
05/06/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
05/08/2019
Stipulation
40
05/10/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.