David M. Decker and Marilyn L. Decker
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2014-bk-00065 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
160
06/06/2018
Postconfirmation Progress Report
161
06/06/2018
Entry of Final Decree
162
06/06/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
06/11/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
163
06/29/2018
Certificate of Service
164
06/29/2018
Certificate of No Objection
165
07/03/2018
Entry of Final Decree
166
07/03/2018
Final Decree (Order from Judge) (SA)
07/03/2018
Close BK Case Utility (See Final Decree for Regular BK Closings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
167
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
168
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.