David Madrigal Fernandez
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00392 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/07/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
11/07/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
11/07/2018
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
11/07/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/08/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
4
11/08/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
11/08/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
6
11/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
7
11/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
11/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
9
11/13/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
11/13/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
11
11/21/2018
Schedules A-J
12
11/21/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
13
11/21/2018
Declaration About Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec and 202)
14
11/21/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
15
11/21/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
16
11/21/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
17
11/21/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
18
11/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
12/14/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
01/18/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
20
01/18/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
21
01/18/2019
Certificate of Service
01/18/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
01/23/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
01/23/2019
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
01/28/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
24
01/29/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
25
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
01/31/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
02/04/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
02/05/2019
Certificate of No Objection
29
02/05/2019
Certificate of Service
02/05/2019
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
02/06/2019
Relief from Stay
31
02/08/2019
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
02/08/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
02/11/2019
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
02/11/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
02/11/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
34
02/11/2019
Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )
35
02/14/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
36
02/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
02/20/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.