David Michael Kopf
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2019-bk-00010 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/16/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
01/16/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
01/16/2019
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
01/16/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/16/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
01/16/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
01/16/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
5
01/16/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
01/16/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
7
01/16/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
01/18/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/18/2019
Credit Counseling Deficiency to Chambers (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
02/05/2019
Request for Special Notice
17
02/07/2019
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
02/19/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
02/20/2019
Show Cause (with hrg) (SA)
02/22/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
02/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
02/28/2019
Proceeding Memo
21
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
22
03/01/2019
Dismissing Case (SA)
23
03/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
03/06/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
03/19/2019
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
25
03/20/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
26
03/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
03/22/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.