David Phillip Stone and Karen Elizabeth Stone
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

5:2018-bk-00132 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
doc
05/22/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
doc
05/31/2018
Avoid Lien (CM07)
06/01/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
20
06/06/2018
Certificate of Service
06/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/27/2018
Certificate of No Objection
22
07/09/2018
Avoid Lien
23
07/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/24/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
07/26/2018
Avoid Lien (CM07)
25
07/26/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
26
08/01/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
27
08/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
28
08/06/2018
Certificate of Service
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.