David S. Steelman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2014-bk-00085 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
75
07/31/2018
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
07/31/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims
77
08/07/2018
Request for Special Notice
78
08/30/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
79
09/05/2018
Withdrawal of Notice of Mortgage Payment Change
80
09/05/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
81
10/04/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
82
10/30/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
83
10/30/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
84
10/30/2018
Certificate of Service
10/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
11/20/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
86
11/26/2018
Hearing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.