Davilei K. Briggs
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80210 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
67
12/14/2018
Adequate Protection
12/14/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
12/14/2018
Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay
69
12/14/2018
Final Hearing Set
70
12/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
72
12/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
76
01/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
77
01/24/2019
Adequate Protection
78
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
79
01/29/2019
Transfer of Claim
01/29/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
02/15/2019
Limit Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.